This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2020 at 08:19:13 (UTC).

McMenamin et al v. Souza

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 McMenamin filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Souza. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10644

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Darcy G. McMenamin

Gerardo A. Portillo

Respondent

Steven J. Souza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Anand Balakrishnan

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad Street, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10004-2400

Matthew Segal

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

211 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02110

Daniel L. McFadden

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

211 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02110

Eunice H. Cho

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

915 15Th St. N.W., 7Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Adriana Lafaille

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

211 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02110

Susan B. Church

Attorney at Demissie & Church

929 Massachusetts Avenue, Suite 01

Cambridge, MA 02139

Respondent Attorney

Rayford A. Farquhar

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Suite 9200

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#39

#38

36 #1

Exhibit A

#36

#35

33 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Reply

#33

#32

#148

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Respect to Petitioner Gerardo A. Portillo by Gerardo A. Portillo. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STATUS REPORT by Gerardo A. Portillo. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Transcript of Continued Video (Zoom) TRO Hearing held on April 9, 2020, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 5/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-10617-WGY, 1:20-cv-10644-WGY(Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STATUS REPORT by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #33 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo Seeking Views of Physicians and Health Professionals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Greifinger Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - BCSO Letter)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Steven J. Souza to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Farquhar, Rayford) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docket(#30) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Hearing set for 4/9/2020 02:00 PM remotely before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be held by video/telephone. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Lafaille on behalf of Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo (Lafaille, Adriana) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Michael Felsen, Esq. by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Dr. Robert Greifinger by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Dr. Jonathan Golob by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Susan Church, Esq. by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Joseph Gregory, Esq. by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8178764 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Darcy G. McMenamin, Gerardo A. Portillo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less