This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:02:30 (UTC).

McMeans v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 3)

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 McMeans filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of Alabama INMATE 3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01039

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas McMeans

Elmore, AL 36025

Defendants

State of Alabama

Kay Ivey

John Crow

Greg Reed

Jefferson S. Dunn

McDonald Russell

Del Marsh

Steven T. Marshall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Stephen Norwood Dodd

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

P O Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER that on or before 2/6/2020, Petitioner shall SHOW CAUSE why his #1 2254 Petition should not be dismissed because it was not filed within the one-year limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d) and for the other reasons asserted by Respondents in their answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/17/2020. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

11 #5

Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Judgement CR-12-1825

11 #3

Exhibit 3 - Brief filed by State CR-12-1825

11 #2

Exhibit 2 - Brief filed by McMeans CR-12-1825

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by State of Alabama, McDonald Russell, Greg Reed, Steven T. Marshall, Del Marsh, Kay Ivey, Jefferson S. Dunn, John Crow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Direct Appeal CR-12-1825, #2 Exhibit 2 - Brief filed by McMeans CR-12-1825, #3 Exhibit 3 - Brief filed by State CR-12-1825, #4 Exhibit 4 - Court of Criminal Appeals memorandum opinion CR-12-1825, #5 Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Judgement CR-12-1825, #6 Exhibit 6 - Record of the appeal CR-15-0295, #7 Exhibit 7 - McMeans Initial Brief CR-15-0295, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Brief CR-15-0295, #9 Exhibit 9 - McMeans Reply brief CR-15-0295, #10 Exhibit 10 - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals Opinion, #11 Exhibit 11 - Butler County Circuit Court Return to Remand, #12 Exhibit 12 - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals memorandum opinion, #13 Exhibit 13 - Certificate of Judgement CR-15-0295)(Dodd, Stephen) Modified on 1/17/2020 to reflect response is filed on behalf of all defendants as noted in the pdf and per counsel. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

11 #4

Exhibit 4 - Court of Criminal Appeals memorandum opinion CR-12-1825

11 #7

Exhibit 7 - McMeans Initial Brief CR-15-0295

11 #6

Exhibit 6 - Record of the appeal CR-15-0295

11 #12

Exhibit 12 - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals memorandum opinion

11 #13

Exhibit 13 - Certificate of Judgement CR-15-0295

11 #10

Exhibit 10 - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals Opinion

11 #11

Exhibit 11 - Butler County Circuit Court Return to Remand

11 #1

Exhibit 1 - Direct Appeal CR-12-1825

11 #9

Exhibit 9 - McMeans Reply brief CR-15-0295

11 #8

Exhibit 8 - State Brief CR-15-0295

#6

(#6) ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 1/23/2020; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR with copies of #1 petition to Warden John Crow & the Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/2/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#10

(#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition, #6 Order signed by Jackie Cooper for Warden John Crow served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Norwood Dodd on behalf of John Crow, Steven T. Marshall (Dodd, Stephen) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER that on or before 2/6/2020, Petitioner shall SHOW CAUSE why his #1 2254 Petition should not be dismissed because it was not filed within the one-year limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d) and for the other reasons asserted by Respondents in their answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/17/2020. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Attorney Stephen Norwood Dodd added as counsel for Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, Del Marsh, Greg Reed, McDonald Russell, and State of Alabama. (dmn, ) (see #11 Response and as verified with counsel) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by State of Alabama, McDonald Russell, Greg Reed, Steven T. Marshall, Del Marsh, Kay Ivey, Jefferson S. Dunn, John Crow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Direct Appeal CR-12-1825, #2 Exhibit 2 - Brief filed by McMeans CR-12-1825, #3 Exhibit 3 - Brief filed by State CR-12-1825, #4 Exhibit 4 - Court of Criminal Appeals memorandum opinion CR-12-1825, #5 Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Judgement CR-12-1825, #6 Exhibit 6 - Record of the appeal CR-15-0295, #7 Exhibit 7 - McMeans Initial Brief CR-15-0295, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Brief CR-15-0295, #9 Exhibit 9 - McMeans Reply brief CR-15-0295, #10 Exhibit 10 - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals Opinion, #11 Exhibit 11 - Butler County Circuit Court Return to Remand, #12 Exhibit 12 - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals memorandum opinion, #13 Exhibit 13 - Certificate of Judgement CR-15-0295)(Dodd, Stephen) Modified on 1/17/2020 to reflect response is filed on behalf of all defendants as noted in the pdf and per counsel. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition, #6 Order signed by Jackie Cooper for Warden John Crow served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for John Crow & Steven T. Marshall. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Norwood Dodd on behalf of John Crow, Steven T. Marshall (Dodd, Stephen) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Crow, Steven T. Marshall. (Dodd, Stephen) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition and #6 Order signed by Sandra Blackmon for Attorney General for the State of Alabama served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/23/2020.(kh, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 1/23/2020; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR with copies of #1 petition to Warden John Crow & the Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/2/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON MOTION: granting #4 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/2/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Thomas McMeans. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement)(amf, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 1/6/2020, McMeans shall either submit the $5.00 filing fee or file the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING the Clerk to SEND McMeans a form for use in filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/16/2019. (IFP form mailed to Plf as directed)(amf, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDERED that the instant petition for habeas corpus relief be construed as one filed under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and henceforth proceed as such a petition. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/12/2019. (kh, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Thomas McMeans. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE)(es, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.