This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:24:08 (UTC).

MCMANN v. GENEX SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 MCMANN filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against GENEX SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00515

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDITH McMANN

Defendants

GENEX SERVICES, LLC

GENEX SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JEREMIAH J TALBOTT PA - PENSACOLA FL

900 E Moreno St

Pensacola, FL 32503

Defendant Attorney

CARLOTTA JUSTINE ROOS

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP - MIAMI FL

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 5300, Wachovia Financial Center

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

8 #4

Text of Proposed Order

8 #3

Exhibit C - Decl of J. Cordova-Barrera

8 #2

Exhibit B - Karen Lieber Decl.

8 #1

Exhibit A - Motion to Compel

#8

(#8) MOTION to Set Aside Default by GENEX SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B - Karen Lieber Decl., #3 Exhibit C - Decl of J. Cordova-Barrera, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (ROOS, CARLOTTA) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#7

(#7) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GENEX SERVICES LLC, per #6 ORDER. (MB) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default, ECF No. #5 , is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter a Clerk's default against Defendant Genex. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to file a motion for default judgment against Genex with evidentiary support and a proposed final judgment for the Courts consideration. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/9/2019. (MOTION For Default Judgment due by 7/10/2019.) (MB) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Entry of Default by JUDITH MCMANN. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUDITH MCMANN. All Defendants. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to GENEX SERVICES LLC. (djb) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

1 #2

Supplement Summons - Genex

1 #1

Exhibit Opt In - Judith McMann

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GENEX SERVICES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4439331.), filed by JUDITH McMANN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt In - Judith McMann, #2 Supplement Summons - Genex) (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Order. (Response time termed). (MB) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: Set Deadlines re #8 Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/28/2019. (Responses not filed). (MB) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Set Aside Default (MB) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines re #8 MOTION to Set Aside Default by GENEX SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit B - Karen Lieber Decl., # 3 Exhibit C - Decl of J. Cordova-Barrera, # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/28/2019). (MB) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Set Aside Default by GENEX SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B - Karen Lieber Decl., #3 Exhibit C - Decl of J. Cordova-Barrera, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (ROOS, CARLOTTA) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GENEX SERVICES LLC, per #6 ORDER. (MB) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default, ECF No. #5 , is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter a Clerk's default against Defendant Genex. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to file a motion for default judgment against Genex with evidentiary support and a proposed final judgment for the Courts consideration. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/9/2019. (MOTION For Default Judgment due by 7/10/2019.) (MB) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Entry of Default (MB) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Entry of Default by JUDITH MCMANN. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUDITH MCMANN. All Defendants. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to GENEX SERVICES LLC. (djb) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GENEX SERVICES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4439331.), filed by JUDITH McMANN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt In - Judith McMann, #2 Supplement Summons - Genex) (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.