This case was last updated from PACER on 04/28/2019 at 07:23:43 (UTC).

McMahan v. Intel Advantage, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 McMahan filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Intel Advantage, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert T. Dawson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06028

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert T. Dawson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer McMahan

Defendants

Patrice Branch

Intel Advantage, LLC

Intel Advantage II, Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey D. Wood

Attorney at The Wood Firm

11610 Pleasant Ridge Rd., Suite 103, Box 208

Little Rock, AR 72223

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(hnc) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Jennifer McMahan of payment of filing fee (Wood, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jennifer McMahan. (hnc) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Patrice Branch, Intel Advantage II, Limited, Intel Advantage, LLC, filed by Jennifer McMahan.(hnc) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Patrice Branch, Intel Advantage II, Limited, Intel Advantage, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Complaint fee received: $400.00, receipt number 2021245. (mjm) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Jennifer McMahan of payment of filing fee (Wood, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/1/2019 (hnc) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(hnc) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jennifer McMahan. (hnc) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Patrice Branch, Intel Advantage II, Limited, Intel Advantage, LLC, filed by Jennifer McMahan.(hnc) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.