This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2022 at 11:20:48 (UTC).

McMahan v. Griffin et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 McMahan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Griffin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darryl K. McMahan

Defendants

Lowell S. Griffin

Western Surety Company

Kenneth B. Clamser

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen P. Agan

Attorney at Hyler & Agan, PLLC

38 Orange St.

Asheville, NC 28801

George B. Hyler, Jr.

Attorney at Hyler & Agan, PLLC

38 Orange Street

Asheville, NC 28801

Defendant Attorney

Sean F. Perrin

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

301 South College St., Suite 3500

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Buncombe County Superior Court File 22-CVS-02682

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

#2

(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company. (Perrin, Sean). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Surety Company (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company.(Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Stay by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company. Responses due by 10/12/2022 (Perrin, Sean). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Stay by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay by Darryl K. McMahan. Replies due by 10/19/2022 (Agan, Stephen) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing on Motions re: (10 in 1:22-cv-00136-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00171-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00172-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00173-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00174-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00175-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00176-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00177-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00178-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00179-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00181-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00182-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00183-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00184-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00185-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00186-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00187-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00188-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay , (5 in 1:22-cv-00189-MR-WCM) Consent MOTION to Stay , and (5 in 1:22-cv-00190-MR-WCM) MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kby) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay by Darryl K. McMahan. Replies due by 10/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Agan, Stephen) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay by Darryl K. McMahan. Replies due by 10/19/2022 (Agan, Stephen) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Stay by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company. Responses due by 10/12/2022 (Perrin, Sean). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company.(Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Surety Company (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, . All Defendants. Text of Order: ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED through and including September 30, 2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/1/2022. (kkb) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin, Western Surety Company. (Perrin, Sean). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rhf) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Buncombe County Superior Court, case number 22-CVS-02682. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5717147), filed by Western Surety Company, Kenneth B. Clamser, Lowell S. Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Buncombe County Superior Court File 22-CVS-02682, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court)(Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less