This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2019 at 08:05:59 (UTC).

McLendon et al v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 McLendon filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Wexford Health Sources, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Russ Walker and Andrew L. Brasher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00623

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan Russ Walker

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Brasher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ashton McLendon

Sherlynn Liptrot

Jalissia Chislum

Defendant

Wexford Health Sources, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen Durham Arnold

Attorney at Fonteneau & Arnold, LLC

2151 Highland Avenue South, Ste. 205

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorney

Philip Piggott

Attorney at Starnes Davis Florie LLP

100 Brookwood Place - 7Th Floor

Birmingham, AL 35209

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#12

(#12) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2019; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 10/18/2019; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/11/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#11

(#11) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources, Inc. re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

10 #1

Conflict Disclosure Statement

#10

(#10) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Wexford Health Sources, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wexford Health Sources, Inc..(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#7

(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #5 Summons signed by Kelly Webster for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PLAINTIFFS) Jalissia Chislum, Sherlynn Liptrot, Ashton McLendon. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Wexford Health Sources, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ashton McLendon. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sherlynn Liptrot. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jalissia Chislum. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

1 #3

Receipt

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

request for service by certified mail

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wexford Health Sources, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054734.), filed by Ashton McLendon, Jalissia Chislum, Sherlynn Liptrot. (Attachments: #1 request for service by certified mail, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2019; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 10/18/2019; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/11/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources, Inc. re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Wexford Health Sources, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEF) Wexford Health Sources, Inc. (cnw, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wexford Health Sources, Inc..(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #5 Summons signed by Kelly Webster for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PLAINTIFFS) Jalissia Chislum, Sherlynn Liptrot, Ashton McLendon. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Wexford Health Sources, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ashton McLendon. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sherlynn Liptrot. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jalissia Chislum. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jalissia Chislum, Sherlynn Liptrot, Ashton McLendon. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Wexford Health Sources, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054734.), filed by Ashton McLendon, Jalissia Chislum, Sherlynn Liptrot. (Attachments: #1 request for service by certified mail, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(cnw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Piggott