This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2019 at 07:31:50 (UTC).

McLemore et al v. Hosemann et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 McLemore filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Hosemann. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00383

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Leslie-Burl McLemore

Jimmie Robinson, Sr.

Charles Holmes

Roderick Woullard

Defendants

Delbert Hosemann

Phillip Gunn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert B. McDuff

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT MCDUFF

767 North Congress Street

Jackson, MS 39202

Marc Elias - PHV

Attorney at PERKINS COIE, LLP - Washington

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Uzoma Nkwonta - PHV

Attorney at PERKINS COIE, LLP - Washington

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Jacki Anderson - PHV

Attorney at PERKINS COIE, LLP - Washington

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Daniel C. Osher - PHV

Attorney at PERKINS COIE, LLP - Washington

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Beth L. Orlansky

Attorney at MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE - Jackson

P. O. Box 1023, 5 Old River Place, Ste. 203 (39202)

Jackson, MS 39215-1023

K'Shaani O. Smith - PHV

Attorney at PERKINS COIE, LLP - Washington

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob A. Bradley

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

William Trey E. Jones, III

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

Cody C. Bailey

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

4 #2

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

4 #1

Attachment Client Information Sheet

#4

3 #2

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

3 #1

Attachment Client Information Sheet

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 16(b)(3)(B) pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Immunity at docket no. #18 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/16/2019. (JEJ) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Immunity filed by Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Immunity by Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting in part #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as set out in the Order. Defendants are hereby ordered to file their response to the complaint by July 15, 2019, and their response to the preliminary-injunction motion by July 29, 2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on June 20, 2019. (SP) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Beth L. Orlansky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Cody C. Bailey on behalf of Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Bailey, Cody) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Nkwonta - PHV, Uzoma) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Jacki Anderson, Marc E. Elias, Uzoma N. Nkwonta, Daniel C. Osher and K'Shaani O. Smith be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiffs in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/10/2019. (JEJ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leslie-Burl McLemore, Charles Holmes, Roderick Woullard, Jimmie Robinson, Sr. Delbert Hosemann served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (McDuff, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (McDuff, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, Riser Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, MS Encyclopedia article on segregation, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, Mabry article on Black disfranchisement, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, Elections Committee proceedings, 1890 Const Convention, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, McDonald article on majority vote requirements, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, Morton article on majority vote requirements, #7 Exhibit Ex 7, Rodden declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex 8, 2015 election results, #9 Exhibit Ex 9, Article on MS educ inequity, #10 Exhibit Ex 10, Tuskegee report on lynching, #11 Exhibit Ex 11, USA Today article on McDaniel statements, #12 Exhibit Ex 12, DJ article on Hyde-Smith statements, #13 Exhibit Ex 13, The Hill article on statement about Espy, #14 Exhibit Ex 14, AP article on minority presence in legislatures, #15 Exhibit Ex 15, CL article on Black elected officials in MS)(McDuff, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for K'Shaani O. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000843) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Daniel C. Osher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000838) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Uzoma N. Nkwonta to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000825) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Marc E. Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000806) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Jacki Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000779) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann. (KNS) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4000191), filed by Leslie-Burl McLemore, Charles Holmes, Roderick Woullard, Jimmie Robinson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Trey E. Jones, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob A. Bradley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cody C. Bailey