This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2019 at 07:53:40 (UTC).

McLean, et al v. Puerto Rico, et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 McLean filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00648

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Defendants

Jennifer Lopez

Armando Christian Perez

Peter Gene Hernandez

Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar

Nydia Velazquez

United States Tennis Association

Jose Juan Borea More

College Athletes Players Association

Camila Cabello

National Scholastic Press Association

Carlos Curbelo

Marco Rubio

Yvette Clarke

Margarita Exquiroz

Anthony Brown

Eduardo J. Padron

Country of Cuba

Carlos Correa

Jlo

Bob Menendez

85 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDERED that McLean's #1 Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

1 #16

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100036209), filed by Vicki Fanning McLean, Estate of James McLean, Estate of Louis Fanning, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Receipt)(dl) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDERED that McLean's #1 Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service by Vicki Fanning McLean. (td) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100036209), filed by Vicki Fanning McLean, Estate of James McLean, Estate of Louis Fanning, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Receipt)(dl) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant