This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:26:33 (UTC).

McLaughlin v. Walmart, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 McLaughlin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard D. Bennett and A. David Copperthite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01305

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Richard D. Bennett

A. David Copperthite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John McLaughlin

Defendants

Walmart, Inc. d/b/a Walmart #1715

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Virginia Vile Tehrani

Attorney at Greenblatt & Veliev, LLC

110 N. Washington St., Suite 402

Rockville, MD 20850

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly Sullivan Kylis

Attorney at McNamee Hosea

888 Bestgate Road, Suite 402

Annapolis, MD 21401

Jennifer M Alexander

Attorney at McNamee Hosea

888 Bestgate Rd, Suite 402

Annapolis, MD 21401

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/21/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#15

(#15) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#14

(#14) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Tehrani, Virginia) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#13

(#13) STANDING ORDER CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/11/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER re Referral for all proceedings; setting deadline for parties to file consent forms; directing #8 Scheduling Order will govern this case; advising of discovery assistance; directing after resolution of any dispositive pretrial motions, counsel will be contacted regarding trial and related scheduling. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/11/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #10 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/11/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for All Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/11/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT by Walmart Inc.(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

8 #1

Informal Discovery Letter

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/15/2021. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter) (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#7

(#7) Correspondence re: Statement Regarding Standing Order Concerning Removal (Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Property Co. for Walmart Inc..(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Walmart Inc..(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/27/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 30 days as to Walmart Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc., filed by John McLaughlin.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/21/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Tehrani, Virginia) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STANDING ORDER CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/11/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re Referral for all proceedings; setting deadline for parties to file consent forms; directing #8 Scheduling Order will govern this case; advising of discovery assistance; directing after resolution of any dispositive pretrial motions, counsel will be contacted regarding trial and related scheduling. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/11/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #10 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/11/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for All Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/11/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT by Walmart Inc.(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/15/2021. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter) (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correspondence re: Statement Regarding Standing Order Concerning Removal (Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Property Co. for Walmart Inc..(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Walmart Inc..(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/27/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR TALBOT COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 30 days as to Walmart Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc., filed by John McLaughlin.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (kos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Talbot County, case number C-20-CV-21-000027. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9297538), filed by Walmart, Inc. d/b/a Walmart #1715. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (State Court Writ of Summons), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Civil Information Report), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant