This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:14:00 (UTC).

MCLAUGHLIN et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 MCLAUGHLIN filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against MERCK CO , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEBBERA MCLAUGHLIN

ROBERT MCLAUGHLIN

Defendants

MERCK & CO., INC.

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

JOHN DOE

JANE DOE

XYZ CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK T. SADAKA

Attorney at SADAKA ASSOCIATES LLC

155 North Dean St 4Th Fl

Englewood, NJ 07631

Defendant Attorney

DINO S. SANGIAMO

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 E Pratt St Ste 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEBBERA MCLAUGHLIN. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (SADAKA, MARK) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEBBERA MCLAUGHLIN. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (SADAKA, MARK) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEBBERA MCLAUGHLIN. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (SADAKA, MARK) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEBBERA MCLAUGHLIN. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (SADAKA, MARK) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. Emailed To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 1/18/22. (va, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., XYZ CORP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BPAEDC-15663456.), filed by DEBBERA MCLAUGHLIN, ROBERT MCLAUGHLIN. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(SADAKA, MARK) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DINO S. SANGIAMO