This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 00:03:52 (UTC).

McLanahan et al v. Green Day Power

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 McLanahan filed an Other lawsuit against Green Day Power. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley, Edmund F. Brennan and Jeremy D. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01931

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judges

Edmund F. Brennan

Jeremy D. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cameron McLanahan

Michael McLanahan

Defendant

Green Day Power

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

S. Chandler Visher

Attorney at Law Offices of S. Chandler Visher

44 Montgomery St., Suite 3830

San Francisco, CA 94104

Ryan M. Kelly, PHV

Attorney at ANDERSON + WANCA

3701 Algonquin Road, Suite 500

Rolling Meadows, IL 60008

Defendant Attorney

Raymond Joseph Muro

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth St., 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/9/2020 ORDERING that Defendant Green Day Power shall have up to and including 1/8/2021, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Green Day Power. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muro, Raymond) Modified on 12/10/2020 (Coll, A). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/12/20 ORDERING that Defendant Green Day Power shall have up to and including December 18, 2020, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

12 #1

Proposed Order on Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Green Day Power

#12

(#12) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Green Day Power to Respond to Initial Complaint by Green Day Power. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order. (Muro, Raymond) Modified on 11/12/2020 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Green Day Power served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Kelly, PHV, Ryan) (Entered: 10/24/2020)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Green Day Power. (Muro, Raymond) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION to Extend time to respond to initial complaint by Green Day Power. (Muro, Raymond) Modified on 10/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Raymond Joseph Muro on behalf of Green Day Power. Attorney Muro, Raymond Joseph added. (Muro, Raymond) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#7

(#7) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/2/2020 ORDERING attorney Ryan M. Kelly, PHV, added for Cameron McLanahan and Michael McLanahan. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Reader, L) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

5 #1

Character Reference Letters good standing letter

#5

(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Michael McLanahan for attorney Ryan M. Kelly to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9152909) (Attachments: #1 Character Reference Letters good standing letter)(Visher, S.) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael McLanahan. Attorney Visher, S. Chandler added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9141363) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Visher, S.) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/9/2020 ORDERING that Defendant Green Day Power shall have up to and including 1/8/2021, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Green Day Power. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muro, Raymond) Modified on 12/10/2020 (Coll, A). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/12/20 ORDERING that Defendant Green Day Power shall have up to and including December 18, 2020, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Green Day Power to Respond to Initial Complaint by Green Day Power. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order. (Muro, Raymond) Modified on 11/12/2020 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Green Day Power served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Kelly, PHV, Ryan) (Entered: 10/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Green Day Power. (Muro, Raymond) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION to Extend time to respond to initial complaint by Green Day Power. (Muro, Raymond) Modified on 10/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Raymond Joseph Muro on behalf of Green Day Power. Attorney Muro, Raymond Joseph added. (Muro, Raymond) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/2/2020 ORDERING attorney Ryan M. Kelly, PHV, added for Cameron McLanahan and Michael McLanahan. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Reader, L) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Michael McLanahan for attorney Ryan M. Kelly to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9152909) (Attachments: #1 Character Reference Letters good standing letter)(Visher, S.) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Green Day Power* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *S. Chandler Visher* *Law Offices of S. Chandler Visher* *44 Montgomery St., Suite 3830* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael McLanahan (Visher, S.) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael McLanahan. Attorney Visher, S. Chandler added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9141363) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Visher, S.) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less