This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2019 at 07:06:01 (UTC).

MCLAIN v. FIVE BELOW, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 MCLAIN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FIVE BELOW, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD A. MCHUGH and JOHN M. YOUNGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03913

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GERALD A. MCHUGH

JOHN M. YOUNGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEGAN F. MCLAIN

Defendants

FIVE BELOW, INC.

ANITA DASHIELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RANIA M. MAJOR

2915 North 5Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19133

Defendant Attorneys

MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DANIEL H. AIKEN

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, 18Th & Cherry Sts.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/6/2019 03:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/17/19. 10/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH TO HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/04/2019. 10/04/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by FIVE BELOW, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(RAZOR, MORGAN) Modified on 9/6/2019 (tjd). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR on behalf of FIVE BELOW, INC. (RAZOR, MORGAN) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent BLACKROCK, INC. for FIVE BELOW, INC.. by FIVE BELOW, INC..(fdc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ANITA DASHIELL, FIVE BELOW, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 19-2993. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202799) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(fdc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/6/2019 03:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/17/19. 10/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH TO HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/04/2019. 10/04/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by FIVE BELOW, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(RAZOR, MORGAN) Modified on 9/6/2019 (tjd). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR on behalf of FIVE BELOW, INC. (RAZOR, MORGAN) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent BLACKROCK, INC. for FIVE BELOW, INC.. by FIVE BELOW, INC..(fdc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ANITA DASHIELL, FIVE BELOW, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 19-2993. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202799) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(fdc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIVE BELOW INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel H. Aiken

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR