This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:32:17 (UTC).

McKinney v. SSA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 McKinney filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SSA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Claria Horn Boom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00060

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claria Horn Boom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chuck Barry McKinney

Defendant

Commissioner of SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glenn Martin Hammond

Attorney at Glenn M. Hammond Law Offices

P.O. Box 1109

Pikeville, KY 41502

Defendant Attorney

Cheryl D. Morgan

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, EDKY

260 W. Vine Street, Suite 300

Lexington, KY 40507-1612

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: (1) Plaintiff move for summary judgment within 60 days; (2) Commissioner file counter-motion or response w/in 30 days; (4) Extensions of time may be granted only if good cause is shown. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/24/2013. (RCB)cc: COR (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: (1) Plaintiff move for summary judgment within 60 days; (2) Commissioner file counter-motion or response w/in 30 days; (4) Extensions of time may be granted only if good cause is shown. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/24/2013. (RCB)cc: COR (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Transcript - Social Security)(Morgan, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (RCB) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and returned electronically to counsel. (RCB) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Chuck Barry McKinney. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4445802) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(RCB) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.