This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2021 at 12:16:59 (UTC).

McKinney v. Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 McKinney filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cameron McGowan Currie and Kaymani D West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00909

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cameron McGowan Currie

Referral Judge

Kaymani D West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth A McKinney

Defendants

Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties

Orangeburg County

Calhoun County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jarrel L Wigger

Attorney at Wigger Law Firm

8086 Rivers Avenue, Suite A

North Charleston, SC 29406

Defendant Attorneys

J Bennett Crites, III

Attorney at Shumaker Loop and Kendrick LLP

176 Croghan Spur Road, Suite 400

Charleston, SC 29407

Damon C Wlodarczyk

Attorney at Riley Pope and Laney LLC

Po Box 11412

Columbia, SC 29211

Daniel C Plyler

Attorney at Smith Robinson LLC

2530 Devine Street, Third Floor

Columbia, SC 29205

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time by Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties. Response to Motion due by 6/10/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Crites, J) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#10

(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Orangeburg County.(Wlodarczyk, Damon) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Orangeburg County. Response to Motion due by 6/1/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Wlodarczyk, Damon) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#8

(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/17/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/1/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 6/1/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/23/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/20/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/17/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/17/2021, Discovery due by 11/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 3/15/2022, Motions due by 11/29/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/4/2022, ADR Statement due by 12/23/2021, Mediation Due by 1/21/2022. Parties shall file pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after April 5, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/26/2021. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties.(Crites, J) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Calhoun County.(Plyler, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Calhoun County.(Plyler, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Calhoun County, Orangeburg County, Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties. (prou, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Elizabeth A McKinney.(prou, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Calhoun County, Orangeburg County, Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9740140.), filed by Elizabeth A McKinney. Service due by 6/28/2021.(prou, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/28/2021.(prou, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time by Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties. Response to Motion due by 6/10/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Crites, J) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Orangeburg County now has until June 7, 2021 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/18/2021.(prou, ) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Orangeburg County.(Wlodarczyk, Damon) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Orangeburg County. Response to Motion due by 6/1/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Wlodarczyk, Damon) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/17/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/1/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 6/1/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/23/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/20/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/17/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/17/2021, Discovery due by 11/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 3/15/2022, Motions due by 11/29/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/4/2022, ADR Statement due by 12/23/2021, Mediation Due by 1/21/2022. Parties shall file pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after April 5, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/26/2021. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties.(Crites, J) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Calhoun County.(Plyler, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Calhoun County.(Plyler, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Calhoun County, Orangeburg County, Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties. (prou, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Elizabeth A McKinney.(prou, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Calhoun County, Orangeburg County, Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9740140.), filed by Elizabeth A McKinney. Service due by 6/28/2021.(prou, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orangeburg, The County of is a litigant

Latest cases where CALHOUN COUNTY, MI, a municipal corporation, all jointly and severally is a litigant

Latest cases where REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAM JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jarrel L Wigger