This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:40:44 (UTC).

Mckinney v. County of Lorain Ohio

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Mckinney filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against County of Lorain Ohio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher A. Boyko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00099

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher A. Boyko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roberta Lowe-Mckinney

Defendants

County of Lorain Ohio

Lorain-Medina Community Based Correctional Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel S. Dubow

Attorney at Spitz Law

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Samuel B. Robb

Attorney at Spitz Law

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Frederick M. Bean

Attorney at Spitz Law

25825 Science Park Drive

Beachwood, OH 44122

Kevin A. Buryanek

Attorney at Spitz Law

25825 Science Park Drive

Beachwood, OH 44122

Defendant Attorneys

Edmond Z. Jaber

Attorney at Mazanec Raskin Ryder

34305 Solon Road

Cleveland, OH 44139

Kathleen M. Minahan

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon

100 Franklin'S Row, 34305 Solon Road

Solon, OH 44139

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

3 #3

*Restricted*

3 #1

Corrected Green Card

#4

(#4) Amended complaint against Lorain-Medina Community Based Corrections Facility. Filed by Roberta Lowe-Mckinney. (Robb, Samuel) Modified text on 2/23/2022 (M,CE). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Roberta Lowe-Mckinney. Lorain-Medina Community Based Corrections Facility waiver sent on 2/18/2022, answer due 4/19/2022 filed on behalf of Roberta Lowe-Mckinney (Robb, Samuel) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit A - Lowe-McKinney Admission Letter

#7

(#7) Motion to consolidate cases, with brief in support, filed by Defendant Lorain-Medina Community Based Correctional Facility. (Minahan, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Sam Robb and adding attorney Kevin A. Buryanek filed by on behalf of Roberta Lowe-Mckinney. (Buryanek, Kevin) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Sam Robb and adding attorney Kevin A. Buryanek filed by on behalf of Roberta Lowe-Mckinney. (Buryanek, Kevin) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to consolidate cases, with brief in support, filed by Defendant Lorain-Medina Community Based Correctional Facility. (Minahan, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by Lorain-Medina Community Based Correctional Facility. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lowe-McKinney Admission Letter)(Minahan, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Roberta Lowe-Mckinney. Lorain-Medina Community Based Corrections Facility waiver sent on 2/18/2022, answer due 4/19/2022 filed on behalf of Roberta Lowe-Mckinney (Robb, Samuel) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended complaint against Lorain-Medina Community Based Corrections Facility. Filed by Roberta Lowe-Mckinney. (Robb, Samuel) Modified text on 2/23/2022 (M,CE). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon County of Lorain Ohio on 1/28/2022, filed on behalf of Roberta Lowe-Mckinney Related document(s) #2 . (I,RA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2022: #1 Corrected Green Card) (I,RA). (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to County of Lorain Ohio placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7019 0700 0001 8423 8565. (M,KS) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon County of Lorain Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketJudge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for damages and reinstatement with jury demand against County of Lorain Ohio. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11226855. Filed by Roberta Lowe-Mckinney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Robb, Samuel) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edmond Z. Jaber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen M. Minahan