This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2022 at 07:08:10 (UTC).

McKinney v. Addan et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 McKinney filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Addan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip P Simon and John E Martin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00182

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

Referral Judge

John E Martin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley McKinney

Defendants

Zakaria Addan

Schneider National Carriers Inc

Not Classified By Court

Galen Bradley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory Kane Sarkisian

Attorney at Sarkisian Sarkisian & Associates

3645 Willowcreek Rd

Portage, IN 46368

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer D Norris

Attorney at Kopka Pinkus Dolin PC - CP/IN

9801 Connecticut Dr

Crown Point, IN 46307

Thomas S Ehrhardt

Attorney at Kopka Pinkus Dolin PC - CP/IN

9801 Connecticut Dr

Crown Point, IN 46307

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Zakaria Addan, Schneider National Carriers Inc., from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D01-2202-CT-000142, filed by Ashley McKinney.(mrm) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, by Zakaria Addan, Schneider National Carriers Inc.(mrm) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S Ehrhardt on behalf of All Defendants (Ehrhardt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the Hammond Division. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 7/8/2022. (rmf) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2022 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties' joint proposed case management plan to be filed by 8/12/2022 in accordance with FRCP 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/11/2022. (smb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#8

(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (smb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sarkisian, Gregory) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer D Norris on behalf of All Defendants (Norris, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) the Court must issue a scheduling order. Upon review of the report, the Court hereby ORDERS: Rule 26(a)(1) initial exchanges must be completed, but not filed with the Court, by 8/30/2022; Plaintiff's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 1/6/2023; Defendants' deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 3/6/2023; The deadline to complete all fact discovery is 6/11/2023; Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Defendants by 8/31/2023; Defendants' expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Plaintiff by 10/2/2023; Rule 26(e) supplements are due by 10/31/2023; The deadline to complete all expert discovery is 12/31/2023; The parties are ordered to conduct mediation, the Court APPROVES the parties' selection of Galen Bradley as mediator, and mediation must be completed and a report filed by 10/31/2023; and The deadline for parties to review and return either the consent to or the declination of the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge is extended to 9/6/2022. The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for 8/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/16/2022. (asd) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) the Court must issue a scheduling order. Upon review of the report, the Court hereby ORDERS: Rule 26(a)(1) initial exchanges must be completed, but not filed with the Court, by 8/30/2022; Plaintiff's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 1/6/2023; Defendants' deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 3/6/2023; The deadline to complete all fact discovery is 6/11/2023; Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Defendants by 8/31/2023; Defendants' expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Plaintiff by 10/2/2023; Rule 26(e) supplements are due by 10/31/2023; The deadline to complete all expert discovery is 12/31/2023; The parties are ordered to conduct mediation, the Court APPROVES the parties' selection of Galen Bradley as mediator, and mediation must be completed and a report filed by 10/31/2023; and The deadline for parties to review and return either the consent to or the declination of the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge is extended to 9/6/2022. The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for 8/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/16/2022. (asd) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer D Norris on behalf of All Defendants (Norris, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sarkisian, Gregory) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED. State Court Case No. 45D01-2202-CT-000142. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(jdb) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (smb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2022 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties' joint proposed case management plan to be filed by 8/12/2022 in accordance with FRCP 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/11/2022. (smb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/11/2022. (smb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the Hammond Division. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 7/8/2022. (rmf) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketJudge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. **NEW CASE** (mrm) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S Ehrhardt on behalf of All Defendants (Ehrhardt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4963670.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D01-2202-CT-00142, filed by Schneider National Carrier Inc, Zakaria Addan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Ehrhardt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, by Zakaria Addan, Schneider National Carriers Inc.(mrm) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Zakaria Addan, Schneider National Carriers Inc., from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D01-2202-CT-000142, filed by Ashley McKinney.(mrm) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas S Ehrhardt