Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2020 at 07:58:30 (UTC).

McKinney et al v. White Oak Transportation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 McKinney filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against White Oak Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Michael P. Mills. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Mills

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joyce McKinney

Larry McKinney

Defendant

White Oak Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Peacock Connell, Jr.

Attorney at MERKEL & COCKE, P.A.

P. O. Box 1388

Clarksdale, MS 38614-1388

Robert Alexander Carson, III

Attorney at MERKEL & COCKE, P.A.

30 Delta Ave.

Clarksdale, MS 38614

Defendant Attorney

Earl W. Houston, II

Attorney at MARTIN, TATE, MORROW & MARSTON

6410 Poplar Avenue, Suite 1000

Memphis, TN 38119-4843

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Larry McKinney, Joyce McKinney. (Connell, Edward)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/9/20. (bnd)

#15

(#15) ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/4/2020. (rtc)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

13 #1

Exhibit A- First Amended Complaint

#13

(#13) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Joyce McKinney, Larry McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- First Amended Complaint) (Connell, Edward)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 3/29/2021 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3-4 days) (spw)

#11

(#11) ORDER re Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/24/2020. (rtc)

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 11/9/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 3/24/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 8/10/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 9/10/2020. Motions due by 11/30/2020. Settlement Conference set for 6/24/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/24/2020. (rtc)

#9

(#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 2/24/2020. (rtc)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Alexander Carson, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carson, Robert)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Earl W. Houston, II on behalf of White Oak Transportation, Inc. to All counsel of record. (Houston, Earl)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Edward Peacock Connell, Jr on behalf of Joyce McKinney, Larry McKinney to Defendants. (Connell, Edward)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Houston, Earl)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by White Oak Transportation, Inc.. (Houston, Earl)

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/17/2020. (rtc)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Larry McKinney, Joyce McKinney. (jwr) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Larry McKinney, Joyce McKinney. (Connell, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/9/20. (bnd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/4/2020. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Joyce McKinney, Larry McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- First Amended Complaint) (Connell, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 3/29/2021 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3-4 days) (spw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/24/2020. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 11/9/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 3/24/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 8/10/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 9/10/2020. Motions due by 11/30/2020. Settlement Conference set for 6/24/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/24/2020. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 2/24/2020. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Alexander Carson, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carson, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Earl W. Houston, II on behalf of White Oak Transportation, Inc. to All counsel of record. (Houston, Earl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Edward Peacock Connell, Jr on behalf of Joyce McKinney, Larry McKinney to Defendants. (Connell, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Houston, Earl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by White Oak Transportation, Inc.. (Houston, Earl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/17/2020. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Larry McKinney, Joyce McKinney. (jwr) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by White Oak Transportation, Inc. from Circuit Court of Panola County, Mississippi, case number CV2019-279. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1760666) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by White Oak Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of Service of Process and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Fling of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Earl W. Houston, II