This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 07:38:38 (UTC).

MCKINLEY v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 MCKINLEY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02548

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANN MCKINLEY

Defendants

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quincy Erica Sauer

Attorney at MACEY SWANSON & ALLMAN

445 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 401

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Lee Mosby

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Peter T. Tschanz

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service Inc., (Delaware) for UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC... (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Quincy Erica Sauer on behalf of Plaintiff ANN MCKINLEY. (Sauer, Quincy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lee Mosby on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ANN MCKINLEY, filed by ANN MCKINLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5495565) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Sauer, Quincy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/30/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Tschanz on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. (Tschanz, Peter) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. (REO) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Right to Sue

1 #4

Proposed Summons

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/30/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service Inc., (Delaware) for UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC... (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lee Mosby on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Tschanz on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. (Tschanz, Peter) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. (REO) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Quincy Erica Sauer on behalf of Plaintiff ANN MCKINLEY. (Sauer, Quincy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ANN MCKINLEY, filed by ANN MCKINLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5495565) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Sauer, Quincy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.