This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 07:24:15 (UTC).

McKinley v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 McKinley filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Saundra Brown Armstrong. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-06243

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Saundra Brown Armstrong

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric McKinley

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson

Janssen Research & Development, LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Bayer HealthCare LLC

Bayer AG

Bayer Pharma AG

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, LLC

Bayer Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nancy Hersh

Attorney at Hersh & Hersh

601 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94102

Jody Lloyd Winter

Attorney at LloydWinter, P.C.

1724 Broadway Street, Suite 6, Fresno

Fresno, CA 93721

Kate Hersh-Boyle

Attorney at Hersh & Hersh

601 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94102-6388

Defendant Attorneys

Noushan Noureddini

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

James Murdica

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sharon D. Mayo

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/1/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #17 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, f/k/a JOHNSON & JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC'S, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S, JOHNSON & JOHNSON'S, BAYER CORPORATION'S, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.'S, AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLCS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, f/k/a JOHNSON & JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLCS, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.S, JOHNSON & JOHNSONS, BAYER CORPORATIONS, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.S, AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLCS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS; DECLARATION OF NOUSHAN NOUREDDINI IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 9/22/2021) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/13/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 02:30 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/13/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Johnson & Johnson.. (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eric McKinley.. (Hersh, Nancy) (Filed on 8/26/2021) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC'S TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/24/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Other Affiliate Janssen Research & Development, LLC, f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, Other Affiliate Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAddress for attorney James Murdica updated on the docket. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, do not bypass the screen and ent er all affiliates or corporate parents. Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded to enter the parties in the order as they were named in the State Court Complaint. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jo hnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT AND OTHER RELATED DOCUMENTS (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG21102314. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16278828). Filed byJanssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noureddini, Noushan) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayer Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer HealthCare LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant