This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2019 at 07:34:30 (UTC).

McKinley et al v. Core Civic et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 McKinley filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Core Civic. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary M. Purcell and Robin J. Cauthron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gary M. Purcell

Presiding Judge

Robin J. Cauthron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RaShawn McKinley

Cushing, OK 74023-5337

Kentrell Williams

Cushing, OK 74023-5337

Defendants

FNU Light

FNU Beard

FNU Lee

Sgt FNU Vansteenbergh

Sgt FNU Plural

Core Civic

Core Civic Medical

Damon Hininger

Lt FNU Hall

Lt E Hebert

FNU Beaming

Raymond Byrd

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER denying #15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/22/2019. (cps) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

15 #1

Envelope

#15

(#15) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RaShawn McKinley, Kentrell Williams. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(em) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

14 #1

Envelope

#14

(#14) LETTER from Kentrell Williams regarding partial filing fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (em) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER Having reviewed the sufficiency of the Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A and 1915(e)(2)(B), the undersigned finds the Complaint is deficient in several respects. Plaintiffs are given the opportunity to file an Amended Complaint to allege their constitutional claims. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on or before April 29th, 2019.re #1 Complaint, filed by RaShawn McKinley, Kentrell Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/9/2019. (sr) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF PLAINTIFFS FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/4/2019. (cps) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#11

(#11) Receipt for Money Received from Kentrell Williams in the amount of $32.70, receipt number OKW500073261 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt mailed to Kentrell Williams #689810 CUSHING-CCF 3200 S Kings Hwy Cushing, OK 74023-5337. Balance remaining on complaint $306.95. (ank) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#9

(#9) ENTER ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay the Initial Partial Filing Fee. Plaintiff is given additional time until April 16th, 2019, to comply with the Courts Order entered on March 11, 2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 3/29/2019. (cps) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#10

(#10) Receipt for Money Received from RaShawn McKinley in the amount of $10.35, receipt number OKW500073145 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt mailed to RaShawn McKinley #746024 CUSHING-CCF 3200 S Kings Hwy Cushing, OK 74023-5337 on 3/29/19. Balance remaining on complaint $339.65. (em) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time by RaShawn McKinley. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(em) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re Doc #2 and #6 . Please see order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 3/11/2019. (cps) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kentrell Williams. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Attachment Supporting Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FNU Beaming, FNU Beard, Raymond Byrd, Core Civic, Core Civic Medical, FNU Hall, E Hebert, Damon Hininger, FNU Lee, FNU Light, FNU Plural, FNU Vansteenbergh filed by Kentrell Williams, RaShawn McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(em) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER denying #15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/22/2019. (cps) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RaShawn McKinley, Kentrell Williams. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(em) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket Annotation: Re #14 Letter, $16.35 of funds receipted as OKW500073261 #11 applied to CIV-19-231-C as intended by plaintiff and ordered by Order #7 in CIV-19-172-C and Order 6 in CIV-19-231-C. (em) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) LETTER from Kentrell Williams regarding partial filing fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (em) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Having reviewed the sufficiency of the Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A and 1915(e)(2)(B), the undersigned finds the Complaint is deficient in several respects. Plaintiffs are given the opportunity to file an Amended Complaint to allege their constitutional claims. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on or before April 29th, 2019.re #1 Complaint, filed by RaShawn McKinley, Kentrell Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/9/2019. (sr) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF PLAINTIFFS FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/4/2019. (cps) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Receipt for Money Received from Kentrell Williams in the amount of $32.70, receipt number OKW500073261 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt mailed to Kentrell Williams #689810 CUSHING-CCF 3200 S Kings Hwy Cushing, OK 74023-5337. Balance remaining on complaint $306.95. (ank) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTER ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay the Initial Partial Filing Fee. Plaintiff is given additional time until April 16th, 2019, to comply with the Courts Order entered on March 11, 2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 3/29/2019. (cps) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Receipt for Money Received from RaShawn McKinley in the amount of $10.35, receipt number OKW500073145 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt mailed to RaShawn McKinley #746024 CUSHING-CCF 3200 S Kings Hwy Cushing, OK 74023-5337 on 3/29/19. Balance remaining on complaint $339.65. (em) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time by RaShawn McKinley. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(em) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re Doc #2 and #6 . Please see order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 3/11/2019. (cps) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kentrell Williams. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS TO CURE DEFICIENCY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiency designated above by the 18th day of March, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 2/26/2019. (cps) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, Doc #1 , and Doc #4 to RaShawn McKinley #746024 and Kentrell Williams #689810 at CUSHING-CCF 3200 S Kings Hwy Cushing, OK 74023-5337 (em) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell.Entered at the direction of the Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 2/22/2019. (em) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NO PREVIOUS Cases (em) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RaShawn McKinley. (em) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FNU Beaming, FNU Beard, Raymond Byrd, Core Civic, Core Civic Medical, FNU Hall, E Hebert, Damon Hininger, FNU Lee, FNU Light, FNU Plural, FNU Vansteenbergh filed by Kentrell Williams, RaShawn McKinley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(em) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.