This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2021 at 09:38:49 (UTC).

McKibben et al v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 McKibben filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and James C. Mahan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00303

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edward McKibben

Eddy Recarte Chavarria

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce D. Tingey

Attorney at Tingey & Tingey

2001 W. Charleston Blvd.

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Caleb Meyer

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

8945 W. Russell Road, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Renee M Finch

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

8945 W. Russell Road, Ste. 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

David M. Gould

Attorney at Messner Reeves, LLP

8945 W. Russell Rd., Ste. 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

David Gould

Attorney at c/o Messner Reeves LLP

8945 W. Russell Road, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation to Remand Matter To The Courts Of The Eighth Judicial District Of Nevada. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc of Order and docket mailed to Eighth Judicial District Court - HAM) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#4

(#4) First STIPULATION And Order To Remand Matter To The Courts Of The Eighth Judicial District Of Nevada And Regarding Plaintiffs Extra-Contractual Allegation/Claim by Defendant State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Finch, Renee) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Finch, Renee) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 2/23/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/10/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Letter received from the Nevada Division of Insurance

1 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint

#1

(#1) First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-21-827744-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6379159) by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Letter received from the Nevada Division of Insurance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Finch, Renee) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation to Remand Matter To The Courts Of The Eighth Judicial District Of Nevada. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc of Order and docket mailed to Eighth Judicial District Court - HAM) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #4 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys David M. Gould and Renee M. Finch. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First STIPULATION And Order To Remand Matter To The Courts Of The Eighth Judicial District Of Nevada And Regarding Plaintiffs Extra-Contractual Allegation/Claim by Defendant State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Finch, Renee) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Finch, Renee) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 2/23/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/10/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-21-827744-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6379159) by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Letter received from the Nevada Division of Insurance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Finch, Renee) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce D. Tingey