This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 07:35:45 (UTC).

McKernan v. Harrington Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 McKernan filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Harrington Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and Jeremiah C. Lynch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

Jeremiah C. Lynch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dave McKernan

Defendants

Harrington Company

Golden West Enterprises

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick T. Gallagher

Attorney at WALL, MCLEAN & GALLAGHER, PLLC

P.O. Box 1413

Anaconda, MT 59711

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn Mahe

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

Justin K. Cole

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#11

(#11) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#10

(#10) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Dave McKernan. (Gallagher, Patrick) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Dave McKernan. (Gallagher, Patrick) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER directing that July 9, 2019 pretrial conference be conducted by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/19/2019. (TCL) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dave McKernan. (APP) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

6 #1

Notice of Filing

#6

(#6) STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (APP) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#5

(#5) Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Kathryn Mahe, Justin K. Cole, Patrick T. Gallagher. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/7/2019. (APP) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#2

(#2) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/2/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/2/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/2/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 10:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/8/2019. (TCL) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial

1 #1

Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-19-55 filed by Golden West Enterprises and Harrington Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit C - Summons) (NOS) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Dave McKernan. (Gallagher, Patrick) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Dave McKernan. (Gallagher, Patrick) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER directing that July 9, 2019 pretrial conference be conducted by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/19/2019. (TCL) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch to reflect time set forth in written order. (KJL) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dave McKernan. (APP) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (APP) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Kathryn Mahe, Justin K. Cole, Patrick T. Gallagher. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/7/2019. (APP) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/2/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/2/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/2/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 10:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/8/2019. (TCL) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2306181. (NOS) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-19-55 filed by Golden West Enterprises and Harrington Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit C - Summons) (NOS) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less