This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/16/2021 at 08:32:39 (UTC).

McKeown v. Nike, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/17/2021 McKeown filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nike, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00833

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bertha McKeown

Defendant

Nike, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zeke Fortenberry

Attorney at Fortenberry Firm PLLC

18333 Preston Rd

Dallas, TX 75252

Defendant Attorneys

Jervonne Denise Newsome

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Max R. Deitchler

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP - AR

234 E. Millsap Roadsuite 200

Fayetteville, AR 72703

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/20/2021. (mcg) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Max R. Deitchler on behalf of Nike, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8633106. (Deitchler, Max) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Nike, Inc..(Deitchler, Max) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER. No later than November 29, 2021, Attorney Zeke Fortenberry shall file the appropriate admissions paperwork with the Clerk of the Court. If Counsel no longer represents Plaintiff in this matter, Counsel shall provide the Court with a contact person and address for Plaintiff Bertha McKeown. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/18/2021. (mcg) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Zeke Fortenberry on behalf of Bertha McKeown. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8688450. (Fortenberry, Zeke) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/18/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/10/2021. (mcg) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/18/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/10/2021. (mcg) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Zeke Fortenberry on behalf of Bertha McKeown. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8688450. (Fortenberry, Zeke) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER. No later than November 29, 2021, Attorney Zeke Fortenberry shall file the appropriate admissions paperwork with the Clerk of the Court. If Counsel no longer represents Plaintiff in this matter, Counsel shall provide the Court with a contact person and address for Plaintiff Bertha McKeown. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/18/2021. (mcg) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Nike, Inc..(Deitchler, Max) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Max R. Deitchler on behalf of Nike, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8633106. (Deitchler, Max) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/20/2021. (mcg) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketNotified Attorney, Zeke O. Fortenberry, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (mcg) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Nike, Inc..(mcg) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mcg) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nike, Inc. (Newsome, Jervonne) (Entered: 10/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal.. (Newsome, Jervonne) (Entered: 10/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nike, Inc. from 471 Judicial District Court in Collin County, Texas, case number 471-05321-2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8627683), filed by Nike, Inc..(Newsome, Jervonne) (Entered: 10/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nike, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Max R. Deitchler