This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2020 at 09:51:21 (UTC).

McKenzie v. Sharp Oilfield Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 McKenzie filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Sharp Oilfield Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David Counts and Ronald C. Griffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00061

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

Referral Judge

Ronald C. Griffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremy McKenzie

Defendant

Sharp Oilfield Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Don Foty

Defendant Attorneys

Steven P. Tepera

Edward A. Cavazos

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sharp Oilfield Services, LLC. (Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Steven P. Tepera added to party Sharp Oilfield Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Sharp Oilfield Services, LLC.(Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Sharp Oilfield Services, LLC. (see) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by Jeremy McKenzie. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeremy McKenzie. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (see) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13326851). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Jeremy McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foty, Don) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less