This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2022 at 09:10:02 (UTC).

McKenzie v. Cellco Partnership

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 McKenzie filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cellco Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Jung and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02797

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve McKenzie

Defendants

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda E. Heystek

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602-3343

Brandon J. Hill

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602-3343

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18977370) filed by Steve McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Steve McKenzie. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Steve McKenzie. Related case(s): Yes (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Steve McKenzie. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Cellco Partnership. (BES) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER of service returned executed on January 12, 2022 by Steve McKenzie as to Cellco Partnership. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER of service returned executed on January 12, 2022 by Steve McKenzie as to Cellco Partnership. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Cellco Partnership. (BES) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Steve McKenzie. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Steve McKenzie. Related case(s): Yes (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Steve McKenzie. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-2797-WFJ-JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18977370) filed by Steve McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda E. Heystek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon J. Hill