This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 11:03:41 (UTC).

MCKENNEY v. KORTES et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 MCKENNEY filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against KORTES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY TORRESEN and JOHN C. NIVISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY TORRESEN

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT W MCKENNEY

Alfred, ME 04002

Defendants

MAJOR TIMOTHY KORTES

CAPTAIN STEVE BUTTS

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) INDICATION by Prisoner ROBERT W MCKENNEY of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office previously notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnw) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#5

(#5) LETTER from Clerks Office regarding collection of fees (mjlt) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) INDICATION by Prisoner ROBERT W MCKENNEY of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mjlt) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due by 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/13/2019 to correct typo) (mtm). (Entered: 05/13/2019)

2 #1

inmate account statement

#2

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due by 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/13/2019 to correct typo) (mtm). (Entered: 05/13/2019)

1 #3

envelope

1 #2

exhaustion of grievance remedies

1 #1

statement of claim

#1

No Description Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INDICATION by Prisoner ROBERT W MCKENNEY of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office previously notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnw) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from Clerks Office regarding collection of fees (mjlt) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INDICATION by Prisoner ROBERT W MCKENNEY of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mjlt) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings : Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 6/3/2019. (mtm) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due by 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/13/2019 to correct typo) (mtm). (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.