This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 08:28:27 (UTC).

MCKENNEY v. FORNISANO et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 MCKENNEY filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against FORNISANO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and LANCE E. WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00303

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

LANCE E. WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT MCKENNEY

Alfred, ME 04002

Defendants

CAPT WAYNE PIKE

OFC CATHY FORNISANO

LT ARLENE JACQUES

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ROBERT MCKENNEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfw) Modified on 8/15/2019 to change text from Response to Order to Show Cause to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (sfw). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/21/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 7/29/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

2 #1

Inmate Account Balance

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT MCKENNEY (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Balance)(sfw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Exhaustion of Grievance Procedures

1 #1

Statement of Claim

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CATHY FORNISANO, ARLENE JACQUES, WAYNE PIKE, filed by ROBERT MCKENNEY. (Service of Process Deadline 9/26/2019) (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim, #2 Exhaustion of Grievance Procedures, #3 Envelope)(sfw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ROBERT MCKENNEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfw) Modified on 8/15/2019 to change text from Response to Order to Show Cause to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (sfw). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/21/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 7/29/2019. (MFS) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 7/29/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT MCKENNEY (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Balance)(sfw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CATHY FORNISANO, ARLENE JACQUES, WAYNE PIKE, filed by ROBERT MCKENNEY. (Service of Process Deadline 9/26/2019) (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim, #2 Exhaustion of Grievance Procedures, #3 Envelope)(sfw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.