This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:44:10 (UTC).

McKenna et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 McKenna filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benjamin H. Settle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05536

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin H. Settle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Heidi McKenna

Andrew McKenna

Defendants

Boston Scientific Corporation

Boston Scientific Corporation doing business as Mansfield Scientific Inc doing business as Microvasive Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Glenn S Draper

Attorney at BERGMAN DRAPER OSLUND

821 Second Ave, Ste 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Bobby J Bradford

Attorney at ALYSTOCK WITKIN KREIS & OVERHOLTZ PLLC

17 East Main Street Ste 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Justin Olson

Attorney at BERGMAN DRAPER OSLUND

821 Second Ave, Ste 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Debra Renee Baggett

Attorney at ALYSTOCK WITKIN KREIS & OVERHOLTZ PLLC

17 East Main Street, Ste 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Daniel J. Thornburgh

Attorney at AYLSTOCK, WITKIN, KREIS & OVERHOLTZ, PLLC

17 East Main Street, Ste 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Sin-Ting Mary Liu

Attorney at ALYSTOCK WITKIN KREIS & OVERHOLTZ PLLC

17 East Main Street Ste 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Defendant Attorney

Hunter K Ahern

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON LLP (WA)

701 5Th Ave Ste 6800

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hunter K Ahern on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

16 #2

Exhibit 12(b)(6)

16 #1

Exhibit 12(b)(2)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Conmplaint, filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12(b)(2), #2 Exhibit 12(b)(6)) Noting Date 8/23/2019, (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#15

(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Boston Scientific Corporation on 7/9/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna. (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#10

(#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel J. Thornburgh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5833171 (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sin-Ting Mary Liu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5833167 (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#8

(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bobby J. Bradford FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5833164 (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY D. Renee Baggett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5833160 (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justin Olson on behalf of Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna. (Olson, Justin) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Glenn S Draper on behalf of Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna. (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Boston Scientific Corporation. (GMR) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries against defendant(s) Boston Scientific Corporation All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5805221), filed by Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Draper, Glenn) Modified on 6/12/2019 (GMR). (Entered: 06/12/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hunter K Ahern on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Conmplaint, filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12(b)(2), #2 Exhibit 12(b)(6)) Noting Date 8/23/2019, (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Boston Scientific Corporation on 7/9/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna. (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel J. Thornburgh for Andrew McKenna,Daniel J. Thornburgh for Heidi McKenna, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sin-Ting Mary Liu for Andrew McKenna,Sin-Ting Mary Liu for Heidi McKenna, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bobby J Bradford for Andrew McKenna,Bobby J Bradford for Heidi McKenna, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Debra Renee Baggett for Andrew McKenna,Debra Renee Baggett for Heidi McKenna, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel J. Thornburgh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5833171 (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sin-Ting Mary Liu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5833167 (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bobby J. Bradford FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5833164 (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY D. Renee Baggett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5833160 (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justin Olson on behalf of Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna. (Olson, Justin) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Glenn S Draper on behalf of Plaintiffs Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna. (Draper, Glenn) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Boston Scientific Corporation. (GMR) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries against defendant(s) Boston Scientific Corporation All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5805221), filed by Andrew McKenna, Heidi McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Draper, Glenn) Modified on 6/12/2019 (GMR). (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hunter K Ahern