This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2023 at 08:26:37 (UTC).

McKelvey v. Ethicon Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2023 McKelvey filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00592

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deanna McKelvey

Defendants

Ethicon Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason C. Chambers

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (ddm) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#3

(#3) ORDER MODIFYING #2 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#4

(#4) SECOND QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#5

(#5) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 31 (Order Staying PPO 26 Deadlines and Requirements). It is HEREBY ORDERED that, for all cases subject to PPO 26 that were filed or transferred into this MDL on or before the date of this Order, the deadlines and requirements under PPO 26 are hereby stayed for a period of 90 days from the date of entry of this order. This Order shall not operate or be construed as a waiver of the parties' rights or obligations under PPO 26. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 02/21/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. (Docketed in pending 2021 and 2023 cases.)(ddm) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 31 (Order Staying PPO 26 Deadlines and Requirements). It is HEREBY ORDERED that, for all cases subject to PPO 26 that were filed or transferred into this MDL on or before the date of this Order, the deadlines and requirements under PPO 26 are hereby stayed for a period of 90 days from the date of entry of this order. This Order shall not operate or be construed as a waiver of the parties' rights or obligations under PPO 26. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 02/21/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. (Docketed in pending 2021 and 2023 cases.)(ddm) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SECOND QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER MODIFYING #2 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (ddm) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Deanna McKelvey. (Direct file MDL) (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12375416) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less