This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 08:21:10 (UTC).

McKeever v. Publix Super Markets, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 McKeever filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Publix Super Markets, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00130

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony L. McKeever

Defendants

Publix Super Markets, Inc.

PepsiCo, Inc.

John Doe Company

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allison Taylor Newell

Attorney at Cohen & Sinowski, P.C.

30 Trammell Street

Marietta, GA 30064

Scott Silver Cohen

Attorney at Cohen and Sinowski, P.C.

30 Trammell St.

Marietta, GA 30064

Defendant Attorneys

Gene Major

Attorney at Fain, Major & Brennan, P.C.

5605 Glendridge Drive, Ne, Suite 900

Atlanta, GA 30342

James William Hardee

Attorney at Fain, Major & Brennan, P.C.

One Premier Plaza, 5605 Glenridge Dr. N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30342

Joseph Stuart Knight

Attorney at Fain, Major & Brennan, P.C.

One Premier Plaza, 5605 Glenridge Drive Ne

Atlanta, GA 30342

Alexander Dewitt Weatherby

Attorney at Weatherby Law Firm, PC

750 Piedmont Avenue Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr.

Attorney at Weatherby Law Firm, PC

750 Piedmont Avenue Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Anthony L. McKeever. (Newell, Allison) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION Extending Discovery Response Date of All Defendants by PepsiCo, Inc.. (Weatherby, Alexander) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Publix Super Markets, Inc.(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by PepsiCo, Inc..(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by PepsiCo, Inc. Originally filed in the State Court of Cobb County on 1/12/22. Discovery ends on 6/13/2022.(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit Answer of PepsiCo

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (dob) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #7 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (dob) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Anthony L. McKeever. (Newell, Allison) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION Extending Discovery Response Date of All Defendants by PepsiCo, Inc.. (Weatherby, Alexander) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Publix Super Markets, Inc.(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by PepsiCo, Inc..(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by PepsiCo, Inc. Originally filed in the State Court of Cobb County on 1/12/22. Discovery ends on 6/13/2022.(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by PepsiCo, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11512348) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Answer of PepsiCo, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEPSICO INC. A CALIFORNIA COROPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Stuart Knight(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr.(Designation Retained)