This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2022 at 10:52:02 (UTC).

McKee v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 McKee filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-04960

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian McKee

Defendants

Juul Labs, Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Ho Young Huh

Riaz Valani

Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc.

Alternative Ingredients, Inc.

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emily Catherine Jeffcott

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

220 W. Garden Street, 9Th Floor

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Appendix Defendants to be Served

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Defendants ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC;, Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Ho Young Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2913: Christian McKee v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-04960-WHO cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Defendants ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC;, Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Ho Young Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Defendants to be Served)(Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17491125). Filed by Christian McKee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 8/30/2022) Modified on 8/31/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eby-Brown Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Altria Client Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Philip Morris USA, Inc. is a litigant