This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 07:43:01 (UTC).

Sullivan v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Sullivan filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00569

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda McIntosh Sullivan

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael W. Bertics

Attorney at Lennon, Camak & Bertics, PLLC

3622 Haworth Drive

Raleigh, NC 27609-7246

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by Plaintiff, and the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 10/30/2020. (Castania, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Process Receipt and Return served on US Attorney General on 12/7/20. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina served on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security on 11/30/2020. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark - Certified copy of Order #4 and file-stamped copies of summonses, complaint, notice of appearance and financial disclosure statements forwarded to U.S. Marshal, along with USM-285 forms. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summonses Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Amanda McIntosh Sullivan. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by Plaintiff, and the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 10/30/2020. (Castania, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #1 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Amanda McIntosh Sullivan (Bertics, Michael) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael W. Bertics on behalf of Amanda McIntosh Sullivan. (Bertics, Michael) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Amanda McIntosh Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285, #8 USM-285) (Bertics, Michael) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less