This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2022 at 07:11:42 (UTC).

McInnis v. Hexcel Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 McInnis filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Hexcel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maryellen Noreika and Sherry R. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01087

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

Referral Judge

Sherry R. Fallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA MCINNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raeann Warner

Attorney at Jacobs & Crumplar, P.A.

750 Shipyard Drive, Suite 200, P. O. Box 1271

Wilmington, DE 19899

Other Attorneys

William R. Adams

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1040

Wilmington, DE 19801

Scott A. Kossoudji

 

Court Documents

#78

(#78) ORDER ADOPTING ORAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION GRANTING #67 Motion to Dismiss - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the September 28, 2022 Oral Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. Raytheon Technologies Corporation's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (D.I. 67) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims against Raytheon Technologies Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Party Raytheon Technologies Corporation terminated. Attorney William R. Adams terminated as to this Defendant. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/13/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#77

(#77) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2023. Discovery due by 5/22/2023. Opening Expert Reports due by 8/7/2023. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 8/21/2023. Status Report due by 6/9/2023. A Status Conference is set for 6/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Dispositive Motions due by 10/27/2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 scheduling teleconference set for October 25, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/13/2022. (lih) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#76

(#76) PROPOSED Scheduling Order by Hexcel Corporation, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Sikorsky Helicopter. (Adams, William) Modified on 10/12/2022 (lih). (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#75

(#75) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Lisa McInnis.(Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#74

(#74) STIPULATION to file Second Amended Complaint by Lisa McInnis. (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#73

(#73) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Lisa McInnis.(Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

72 #3

Exhibit Amended Complaint

72 #2

Exhibit Docket, E.D. Pa.

72 #1

Exhibit Judge Robreno's Order, 8/16/22

72 #72

Main Document

71 #2

Affidavit

71 #1

Text of Proposed Order

71 #71

Main Document

70 #2

Verification

70 #1

Text of Proposed Order

70 #70

Main Document

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ORDER ADOPTING ORAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION GRANTING #67 Motion to Dismiss - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the September 28, 2022 Oral Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. Raytheon Technologies Corporation's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (D.I. 67) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims against Raytheon Technologies Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Party Raytheon Technologies Corporation terminated. Attorney William R. Adams terminated as to this Defendant. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/13/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2023. Discovery due by 5/22/2023. Opening Expert Reports due by 8/7/2023. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 8/21/2023. Status Report due by 6/9/2023. A Status Conference is set for 6/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Dispositive Motions due by 10/27/2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 scheduling teleconference set for October 25, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/13/2022. (lih) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) PROPOSED Scheduling Order by Hexcel Corporation, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Sikorsky Helicopter. (Adams, William) Modified on 10/12/2022 (lih). (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Lisa McInnis.(Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 75 has been deleted per the request of the filer. A revised version of the document will be filed shortly. (lih) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED- re #74 STIPULATION to file Second Amended Complaint. Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2022.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/3/2022. (lih) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) STIPULATION to file Second Amended Complaint by Lisa McInnis. (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The document previously filed as D.I. 74 has been deleted per the request of the filer. A revised version of the document will be filed at a later time. (lih) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #74 has been modified to properly identify the document. Counsel is advised to use the correct event code when filing of document of this nature in the future. (lih) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Lisa McInnis.(Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Lockheed Martin Corporation with Certificate of Service by SIKORSKY HELICOPTER.(ADAMS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by SIKORSKY HELICOPTER re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney) (Notice of Joinder in Removal) (ADAMS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docket(#7) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by INGRID H. GRAFF on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GRAFF, INGRID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED BAKRY on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL (BAKRY, MOHAMED) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL (SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(SMITH, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16049604), filed by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(SMITH, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM R. ADAMS