This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2019 at 07:44:12 (UTC).

McInnes v. The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 McInnes filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray M. Borden and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gray M. Borden

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gavin McInnes

Defendant

The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronald D. Coleman

Attorney at MANDELBAUM SALSBURG PC

1270 Avenue Of The Americas; Suite 1808

New York, NY 10020

Lauren X. Topelsohn

Attorney at MANDELBAUM SALSBURG PC

1270 Avenue Of The Americas; Suite 1808

New York, NY 10020

George Baron Coleman

Attorney at Baron Coleman Law Firm

P O Box 789

Montgomery, AL 36101-0789

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Woodforde Maxymuk

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill PA

P O Box 347

Montgomery, AL 36101

Robert David Segall

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill

Po Box 347

Montgomery, AL 36101-0347

Shannon Lynn Holliday

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

Po Box 347

Montgomery, AL 36101-0347

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Woodforde Maxymuk on behalf of The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Maxymuk, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#15

(#15) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

12 #2

Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee

12 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#12

(#12) Motion for Ronald D. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602052455.) by Gavin McInnes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee)(dmn, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

11 #2

Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee

11 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#11

(#11) Motion for Lauren X. Topelsohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602052456.) by Gavin McInnes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee)(dmn, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#10

(#10) SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency re: Pro Hac Vice Admission to Attorney Lauren X. Topelsohn. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#9

(#9) SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency re: Pro Hac Vice Admission to Attorney Ronald D. Coleman. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's motion to continue (doc. no. #5 ) and plaintiff's response (doc. no. #7 ), it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and defendant is allowed until 4/6/2019, to file a response in this case. Answer due from The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. on 4/6/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/21/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Gavin McInnes. (Coleman, George) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER directing plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the #5 Motion to Continue the Deadline for Filing a Response to the Complaint should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/15/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Holliday, Shannon) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by name illegible for The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gavin McInnes. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

1 #2

fee receipt

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Woodforde Maxymuk on behalf of The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Maxymuk, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Ronald D. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/25/2019. (dmn, )(NO PDF) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Lauren X. Topelsohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/25/2019. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Motion for Ronald D. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602052455.) by Gavin McInnes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee)(dmn, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Motion for Lauren X. Topelsohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602052456.) by Gavin McInnes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee)(dmn, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency re: Pro Hac Vice Admission to Attorney Lauren X. Topelsohn. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency re: Pro Hac Vice Admission to Attorney Ronald D. Coleman. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's motion to continue (doc. no. #5 ) and plaintiff's response (doc. no. #7 ), it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and defendant is allowed until 4/6/2019, to file a response in this case. Answer due from The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. on 4/6/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/21/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Gavin McInnes. (Coleman, George) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER directing plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the #5 Motion to Continue the Deadline for Filing a Response to the Complaint should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/15/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • ***Attorney Robert David Segall added for The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Holliday, Shannon) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by name illegible for The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gavin McInnes. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gavin McInnes. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052254.), filed by Gavin McInnes. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less