This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2021 at 11:02:16 (UTC).

MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C., et al v. THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L L C filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOE L. WEBSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00107

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.

MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,

Defendant

THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL J. BYRNE

Attorney at EVERETT GASKINS HANCOCK, LLP

Pob 911

Raleigh, NC 27602-0911

ANTHONY J. JORGENSON

Attorney at HALL, ESTILL, HARDWICK, GABLE, GOLDEN & NELSON, P.C.

100 North Broadway, Suite 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

KATIE N. WAGNER

Attorney at HALL, ESTILL, HARDWICK, GABLE, GOLDEN & NELSON, P.C.

100 North Broadway, Suite 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

R. ROBERT IMAD EL-JAOUHARI

Attorney at CRANFILL, SUMNER & HARTZOG LLP

5420 Wade Park Blvd., Ste. 300

Raleigh, NC 27607

MATTHEW E. COX

Attorney at MATTHEW E. COX, LLC

1325 Park Street, Ste. 200

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney R. ROBERT IMAD EL-JAOUHARI on behalf of Defendant THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. (EL-JAOUHARI, R. ROBERT) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

18 #1

Exhibit

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COX, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

17 #2

Exhibit Memo Exhibits

17 #1

Memo in Support of Motion

#17

(#17) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. Response to Motion due by 4/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Memo Exhibits)(COX, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#16

(#16) Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 4/26/2021 (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ANTHONY J. JORGENSON on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,, MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3009490.) (JORGENSON, ANTHONY) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER Appointing RICHARD D. CONNER, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(b). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Bond, Melisa) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 4/21/2021 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (COX, MATTHEW) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/26/2021 with permanent pdf image.) (Taylor, Abby). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (COX, MATTHEW) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (BYRNE, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (COX, MATTHEW) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney R. ROBERT IMAD EL-JAOUHARI on behalf of Defendant THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. (EL-JAOUHARI, R. ROBERT) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COX, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. Response to Motion due by 4/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Memo Exhibits)(COX, MATTHEW) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 4/26/2021 (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ANTHONY J. JORGENSON on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,, MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3009490.) (JORGENSON, ANTHONY) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Appointing RICHARD D. CONNER, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(b). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Bond, Melisa) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 5/28/2021. (Bond, Melisa) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 03/15/2021, granting #11 Motion for Protective Order as set out herein. (Taylor, Abby) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER APPROVING JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT ANDLOCAL RULE 5.5 REPORT signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 03/15/2021. Discovery shall be placed on a case-management track designated in LR 26.1(a) as Complex. Plaintiffs' Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2021., Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2021., Discovery due by 09/13/2021., Joinder of Parties for Plaintiffs due by 4/15/2021., Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 4/15/2021.The parties agree that the mediator shall be Richard Conner. The parties do not, at this time, consent to trial by a Magistrate Judge Trial of the action is expected to take approximately 2-3 days. A jury trial has not been demanded.(Taylor, Abby) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred: RE: #9 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, #10 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties, #11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 4/21/2021 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (COX, MATTHEW) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/26/2021 with permanent pdf image.) (Taylor, Abby). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (COX, MATTHEW) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (BYRNE, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2982616), filed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BYRNE, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION ACCESS SERVICES CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where MCI Communications Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Elliott Cox