This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:56:31 (UTC).

MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., et al v. BRAZCOM, INC., et al.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against BRAZCOM, INC . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are L. PATRICK AULD and WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00520

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.

MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

SYDNEY DE OLIVEIRA

BRAZCOM, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL J. BYRNE

Attorney at BYRNE LAW, P.C.

3130 Fairhill Dr., Ste. 108

Raleigh, NC 27612

JAMES J. PROSZEK

Attorney at HALL ESTILL

320 S. Boston Ave., Ste. 200

Tulsa, OK 74103

MATTHEW R. GILE

Attorney at HALL, ESTILL, HARDWICK, GABLE, GOLDEN & NELSON, P.C.

100 North Broadway, Suite 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:18-cv-1005 by Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. filed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:18-cv-1005 by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2019 (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. as to BRAZCOM, INC. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. on Summons Brazcom, Inc. (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

8 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#8

(#8) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

7 #5

Summons issued

7 #2

Summons issued to Oliveira

7 #1

Summons issued for Oliveira

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to BRAZCOM, INC., SYDNEY DE OLIVEIRA. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for Oliveira, #2 Summons issued to Oliveira, #3 Summons issued to Oliveira, #4 Summons issued, #5 Summons issued) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED DOCUMENT by MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. Amendment to #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, . (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC. identifying Corporate Parent VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., Corporate Parent MCI BROADBAND SOLUTIONS, INC., Corporate Parent VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES INC., Corporate Parent MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION, Corporate Parent VERIZON BUSINESS GLOBAL LLC, Corporate Parent TERREMARK WORLDWIDE, INC. for MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC... (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. identifying Corporate Parent VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., Corporate Parent VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES INC., Corporate Parent MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION, Corporate Parent VERIZON BUSINESS GLOBAL LLC for MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP... (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW R. GILE on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (GILE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES J. PROSZEK on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2572121.)(Related Case # 1:18-CV-01005-WO-LPA), filed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BYRNE, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:18-cv-1005 by Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. filed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:18-cv-1005 by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2019 (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. as to BRAZCOM, INC. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. on Summons Brazcom, Inc. (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to BRAZCOM, INC., SYDNEY DE OLIVEIRA. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for Oliveira, #2 Summons issued to Oliveira, #3 Summons issued to Oliveira, #4 Summons issued, #5 Summons issued) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED DOCUMENT by MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. Amendment to #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, . (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC. identifying Corporate Parent VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., Corporate Parent MCI BROADBAND SOLUTIONS, INC., Corporate Parent VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES INC., Corporate Parent MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION, Corporate Parent VERIZON BUSINESS GLOBAL LLC, Corporate Parent TERREMARK WORLDWIDE, INC. for MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC... (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. identifying Corporate Parent VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., Corporate Parent VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES INC., Corporate Parent MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION, Corporate Parent VERIZON BUSINESS GLOBAL LLC for MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP... (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW R. GILE on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (GILE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES J. PROSZEK on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (PROSZEK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2572121.)(Related Case # 1:18-CV-01005-WO-LPA), filed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BYRNE, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.