Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 09:54:53 (UTC).

MCI Communications Service LLC. et al . v. Clark Construction Group LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 MCI Communications Service LLC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Clark Construction Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02556

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCI Communications Service LLC and MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp.

MCI Communications Services, LLC

MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp.

Defendants

Clark Civil LLC

Clark Foundations LLC

Clark Construction Group LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon R Nagy

Attorney at Stinson LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp., MCI Communications Services, LLC. (Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp., MCI Communications Services, LLC. (Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#8

(#8) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp. (Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, LLC (Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

5 #1

Attachment

#5

(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, LLC, MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

4 #1

Attachment

#4

(#4) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, LLC, MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#3

(#3) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/3/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Clark Civil LLC, Clark Construction Group LLC, Clark Foundations LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

1 #4

Summons Clark Foundations

1 #3

Summons Clark Construction Group

1 #2

Summons Clark Civil

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT MCI Communications Services LLC and MCI Access Transmission Services Corp. against Clark Civil LLC, Clark Construction Group LLC, Clark Foundations LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8843117.), filed by MCI Communications Service LLC and MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Clark Civil, #3 Summons Clark Construction Group, #4 Summons Clark Foundations)(Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp., MCI Communications Services, LLC. (Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp., MCI Communications Services, LLC. (Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp., MCI Communications Services, LLC. (Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp. (Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, LLC (Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clark Civil LLC, Clark Construction Group LLC, Clark Foundations LLC, filed by MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp., MCI Communications Services, LLC.(Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, LLC, MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, LLC, MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/3/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Clark Civil LLC, Clark Construction Group LLC, Clark Foundations LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT MCI Communications Services LLC and MCI Access Transmission Services Corp. against Clark Civil LLC, Clark Construction Group LLC, Clark Foundations LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8843117.), filed by MCI Communications Service LLC and MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Clark Civil, #3 Summons Clark Construction Group, #4 Summons Clark Foundations)(Nagy, Brandon) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCI Metro Access Transmission Services Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where MCI Communications Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon R Nagy