This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2022 at 07:16:24 (UTC).

MCHUGH v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On July 27, 2022, Patrick McHugh (“Plaintiff”), represented by Daniel S. Orlow, filed a civil rights action against Amazon.com Services, LLC; Amazon.com Services, Inc.; and Amazon.com Dedc, LLC (collectively “Amazon” or “Defendants”), seeking declaratory relief and damages for Defendants’ alleged unlawful discrimination and retaliation. This case was filed in U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey with Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Judge Sharon A. King presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “Plaintiff was hired by Defendants on or about September 9, 2013 as an Area Manager. In or about June 2015 Plaintiff was promoted to Operations Manager based on his performance and qualifications. In or about September 2017 Plaintiff was recruited to oversee an ‘Amazon Fresh’ fulfillment center, again based on his performance and qualifications.”

The plaintiff further stated, “Upon his transfer to Senior Manager of Program Management for Launch Operations, Plaintiff reported to Karthik Gangiredla, Director. In the Spring of 2020 Plaintiff began reporting directly to Patrick Goodwin.”

The plaintiff alleged, “Shortly after Plaintiff began reporting to Goodwin, Defendants re-organized various aspects of its executions teams and created multiple new positions with the title Senior Regional Manager. On or about September 17, 2020, Defendants failed to promote Plaintiff to Senior Regional Manager. Gangiredla and Patel made the decision to promote Syed to the Senior Regional Manager position instead of Plaintiff.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Defendants told Plaintiff that Syed was the preferable candidate for the position. Gangiredla and Patel have demonstrated a bias in favor of Indian employees with respect to promotional opportunities within their respective organizations. Following Syed’s promotion to Senior Regional Manager, Gangiredla ignored Plaintiff, substantially limited his communication with him, excluded him from communications related to his job duties, and repeatedly moved or cut short scheduled one-on-one meetings with him.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “On or about September 20, 2020, Plaintiff asked Patel why he had not been promoted to Senior Regional Manager. On or about January 13, 2021, Gangiredla unjustly criticized Plaintiff’s direct report, Kathryn Budd (female) and blamed her for the performance failures of a male co-worker. On or about January 19, 2021, in a phone call with Syed, Plaintiff complained of sex discrimination in connection with Defendants’ treatment of Budd (female). After Plaintiff informed Budd that she would be issued a Coaching Plan, Syed unjustly criticized Plaintiff’s performance, and told Plaintiff that his performance had not met expectations for 2020. Syed made numerous false statements and misrepresentations of fact in his feedback to Plaintiff.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “Before Plaintiff complained of sex discrimination, Plaintiff had not received any indication that Defendants supposedly found his performance to be deficient. On or about  February 18 and 23, 2021, Plaintiff informed Jessica Duenas (human resources) that he did not understand how he went from a promotional track to not meeting expectations in a matter of months, and that he had received no negative feedback throughout the previous year. Gangiredla blamed Plaintiff for things outside his control and unjustly criticized his performance.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “As a direct and proximate result of the discriminatory and retaliatory conduct of Defendants, Plaintiff has in the past incurred, and may in the future incur, a loss of earnings and/or earning capacity, loss of benefits, pain and suffering, embarrassment, humiliation, loss of self- esteem, mental anguish, and loss of life’s pleasures, the full extent of which is not known at this time.”

Plaintiff stated three claims for relief, including claims for the alleged violation of Title VII, Section 1981 and the New Jersey Law Against Discrimination.

In its prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment for declaratory relief and an award of damages, along with costs of litigation and reasonable attorney’s fees.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04774

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICK MCHUGH

Defendants

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.

AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL S. ORLOW

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACI LAW, LLC

110 Marter Avenue, Suite 502

Moorestown, NJ 08057

Defendant Attorneys

KEITH J. ROSENBLATT

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

One Newark Center, 8Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

RACHEL SIMONE FREY

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

1085 Raymond Blvd, 8Th Floor

Newark, NJ 08625

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13591545) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PATRICK MCHUGH.(ORLOW, DANIEL) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/28/2022) (jab, ). (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATRICK MCHUGH. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATRICK MCHUGH. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATRICK MCHUGH. AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL SIMONE FREY on behalf of AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (FREY, RACHEL) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL SIMONE FREY on behalf of AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (FREY, RACHEL) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATRICK MCHUGH. AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATRICK MCHUGH. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATRICK MCHUGH. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketJudge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13591545) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PATRICK MCHUGH.(ORLOW, DANIEL) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/28/2022) (jab, ). (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less