This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:24:44 (UTC).

MCGUFFIN v. WALLACE

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 MCGUFFIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WALLACE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel Schneider and Renee Marie Bumb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-13526

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENEE MCGUFFIN

Defendant

JIMMIE L. WALLACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP J. COHEN

Attorney at KAMENSKY-COHEN & ASSOCIATES

194 South Broad Street

Trenton, NJ 08608

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS L. WILKINSON

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CHARLES A. LITTLE

304 Harper Drive, Suite 202

Moorestown, NJ 08057

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.( WILKINSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT to correct signature against JIMMIE L. WALLACE, filed by RENEE MCGUFFIN.(COHEN, PHILIP) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JIMMIE L. WALLACE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9726655) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RENEE MCGUFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(COHEN, PHILIP) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#7

(#7) Order Initial Conference set for 9/11/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/29/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JIMMIE L. WALLACE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RENEE MCGUFFIN. (COHEN, PHILIP) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RENEE MCGUFFIN. JIMMIE L. WALLACE waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (COHEN, PHILIP) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Initial Conference set for 9/11/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/29/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.( WILKINSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RENEE MCGUFFIN. JIMMIE L. WALLACE waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (COHEN, PHILIP) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT to correct signature against JIMMIE L. WALLACE, filed by RENEE MCGUFFIN.(COHEN, PHILIP) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The COMPLAINT #1 submitted by PHILIP J. COHEN on 06/07/2019 contains an improper signature. The filing attorney's name must follow the s/ on electronically filed documents. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ssp, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JIMMIE L. WALLACE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RENEE MCGUFFIN. (COHEN, PHILIP) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JIMMIE L. WALLACE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9726655) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RENEE MCGUFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(COHEN, PHILIP) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.