This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 21:30:32 (UTC).

McGraw Hill LLC et al v. Doe 1 et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 McGraw Hill LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00356

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

McGraw Hill LLC

Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC

Cengage Learning, Inc.

Pearson Education, Inc.

Defendant

Ozodbek Abdulazizov

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Istvan Fleischman

Attorney at Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP

5225 Wisconsin Ave, Nw, Ste 503

Washington, DC 20015

Matthew Jan Oppenheim

Attorney at Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP

4530 Wisconsin Ave, Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Michele Harrington Murphy

Attorney at Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP

5225 Wisconsin Ave, Nw, Ste 503

Washington, DC 20015

Other Attorneys

Brett Thomas Perala

Attorney at Rosenberg, Giger & Perala P.C.

1330 Avenue Of The Americas, Suite 1800

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#77

76 #1

Exhibit A

#76

#75

#74

#73

#72

#71

#70

5 #10

Exhibit 10

5 #9

Exhibit 9

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Ex C

1 #2

Ex B

1 #1

Ex A

#1

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #77 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. Related Document Number: #74 ..(Fleischman, Matthew) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) DECLARATION of Matthew I. Fleischman in Support re: #74 MOTION to Serve by Email.. Document filed by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Fleischman, Matthew) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #74 MOTION to Serve by Email. . Document filed by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc...(Fleischman, Matthew) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) MOTION to Serve by Email. Document filed by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc...(Fleischman, Matthew) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS DELHI BOOKSTROE, INC., JAE Y. CHOI, AND STEVEN MUN: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i); see also In re AOL Time Warner Inc. Sec. & "Erisa" Litig., No. 02 CV. 5575 SWK, 2007 WL 2746818, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 20, 2007), Rule 15, Rule 21, the Court's inherent power, and a settlement that was reached between the parties, Plaintiffs McGraw Hill LLC, Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Elsevier Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., and Cengage Learning, Inc., hereby give notice that their claims in the above-captioned action against Delhi Bookstroe, Inc., Jae Y. Choi, and Steven Mun, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. For avoidance of doubt, the Preliminary Injunction Order currently in place (ECF Doc. 37) regarding a temporary restraint on Defendants' account(s) with banks, financial institutions, and credit card or other payment processing companies is immediately dissolved with prejudice as to Delhi Bookstroe, Inc., Jae Y. Choi, and Steven Mun only. SO ORDERED., Steven Mun, Jae Y Choi and Delhi Bookstore, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 12/28/2020) (ama) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #72 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Jae Y Choi, Delhi Bookstore, Inc., Steven Mun. Document filed by McGraw Hill LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Fleischman, Matthew) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT YOHANES HSU: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i); see also In re AOL Time Warner Inc. Sec. & "Erisa" Litig., No. 02 CV. 5575 SWK, 2007 WL 2746818, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 20, 2007), Rule 15, Rule 21, the Court's inherent power, and a settlement that was reached between the parties, Plaintiffs McGraw Hill LLC, Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Elsevier Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., and Cengage Learning, Inc., hereby give notice that their claims in the above-captioned action against Yohanes Hsu, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees., Yohanes Hsu terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 12/15/2020) (nb) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #70 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Matthew I. Fleischman in Support re: #4 Memorandum of Law in Support,. Document filed by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Fleischman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Fleischman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mosby Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Elsevier STM Inc., Corporate Parent RELX PLC, Corporate Parent RELX NV, Corporate Parent RELX Inc. for Elsevier Inc.; Corporate Parent Macmillan Holdings, LLC for Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC; Corporate Parent Pearson Plc for Pearson Education, Inc.; Corporate Parent McGraw-Hill Global Education Intermediate Holdings, LLC for McGraw Hill LLC; Other Affiliate KKR Asset Management, Other Affiliate KKR & Co. L.P. for Cengage Learning, Inc.. Document filed by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc..(Fleischman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Matthew Jan Oppenheim for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (jgo) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketShow Cause Hearing set for 1/28/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Matthew Jan Oppenheim to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jgo) (pc). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ozodbek Abdulazizov, Burhan Aydin, Hafize Budak, Buy It Now Bargains LLC, Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, Doe 4, Doe 5, Doe 6, Doe 7, Doe 8, Doe 9, Five To One Liquidators, LLC, Julie Hale, Nathan Hale, Benjamin Levy, Sanjay Mittal, Steven Noe, Denis Okhman. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401252517)Document filed by Elsevier Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc..(jgo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2020: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C) (pc). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less