This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2022 at 08:24:03 (UTC).

McGowin v. The Terminix International Company., LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 McGowin filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against The Terminix International Company , LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William H. Steele and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Steele

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Courtney McGowin

Defendants

The Terminix International Company, LP

Terminix International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Chris Cochran

Attorney at CAMPBELL LAW, PC

5336 Stadium Trace Pkwy, Suite 206

Birmingham, AL 35244

Thomas F. Campbell

5336 Stadium Trace Pkwy., Suite 206

Birmingham, AL 35244

Alexandria Leigh Carter

Attorney at Campbell Law, P.C.

5336 Stadium Trace Parkway, Suite 206

Birmingham, AL 35244

Defendant Attorneys

E. Glenn Waldrop

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

James W. Gibson

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3021552, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Courtney McGowin. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Contract, #2 Exhibit 2. Motion to Appoint Arbitrator, #3 Exhibit 3. Order Appoint Arbitrator Reggie Copeland, #4 Exhibit 4. Arbitrator's Award) (Cochran, J.) Modified on 6/9/2022 (cmj). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1. Contract

1 #2

Exhibit 2. Motion to Appoint Arbitrator

1 #3

Exhibit 3. Order Appoint Arbitrator Reggie Copeland

1 #4

Exhibit 4. Arbitrator's Award

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet.filed by Courtney McGowin. Modified on 6/9/2022 (cmj). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Order for plaintiff to file an amended motion satisfactorily alleging the limited partnership's citizenship, as set out. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 8/2/2022.) Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/19/22. (cmj) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#4

(#4) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Motion to Amend Arbitration Award and Grant Final Judgement filed by Courtney McGowin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Terminix Contract, #2 Exhibit Petition to Appoint Arbitrator, #3 Exhibit Order to Appoint Arbitrator, #4 Exhibit Arbitration Award) (Cochran, J.) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

4 #1

Exhibit Terminix Contract

4 #2

Exhibit Petition to Appoint Arbitrator

4 #3

Exhibit Order to Appoint Arbitrator

4 #4

Exhibit Arbitration Award

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Motion to Amend Arbitration Award and Grant Final Judgement Referred to Judge William H. Steele. (cjr) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Motion to Amend Arbitration Award and Grant Final Judgement filed by Courtney McGowin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Terminix Contract, #2 Exhibit Petition to Appoint Arbitrator, #3 Exhibit Order to Appoint Arbitrator, #4 Exhibit Arbitration Award) (Cochran, J.) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for plaintiff to file an amended motion satisfactorily alleging the limited partnership's citizenship, as set out. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 8/2/2022.) Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/19/22. (cmj) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #1 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award to Judge Steele. (cmj) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Courtney McGowin; ref to Judge Steele. (See image at document 1) (cmj) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet.filed by Courtney McGowin. Modified on 6/9/2022 (cmj). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3021552, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Courtney McGowin. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Contract, #2 Exhibit 2. Motion to Appoint Arbitrator, #3 Exhibit 3. Order Appoint Arbitrator Reggie Copeland, #4 Exhibit 4. Arbitrator's Award) (Cochran, J.) Modified on 6/9/2022 (cmj). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E Glenn Waldrop, Jr