This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2020 at 09:34:01 (UTC).

McGowan v. Town of Williamstown, et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 McGowan filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Town of Williamstown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine A. Robertson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-30131

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine A. Robertson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott E McGowan

Defendants

Kyle Johnson

Jason Hoch

Town of Williamstown, Massachusetts, The

Town of Williamstown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David A. Russcol

Defendant Attorneys

Patricia M. Rapinchuk

Hunter S. Keil

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter S. Keil on behalf of Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown (Keil, Hunter) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

8 #4

Exhibit D

8 #3

Exhibit C

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion of the Defendants to Partially Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint Memorandum in Support of Motion of the Defendants to Partially Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion of the Defendants to Partially Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint by Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown.(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M. Rapinchuk on behalf of Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown (Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Scott E McGowan.. (Russcol, David) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott E McGowan. All Defendants. (Russcol, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

1 #3

Civil Category Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8370698 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Scott E McGowan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Form)(Russcol, David) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter S. Keil on behalf of Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown (Keil, Hunter) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion of the Defendants to Partially Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint Memorandum in Support of Motion of the Defendants to Partially Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion of the Defendants to Partially Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint by Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown.(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M. Rapinchuk on behalf of Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown (Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Scott E McGowan.. (Russcol, David) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott E McGowan. All Defendants. (Russcol, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Jason Hoch, Kyle Johnson, Town of Williamstown. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8370698 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Scott E McGowan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Form)(Russcol, David) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less