This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 08:11:09 (UTC).

McGowan et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 McGowan filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00162

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank McGowan

Paula McGowan

Defendant

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Paul Fuller

Attorney at Fuller Sloan, LLC

10475 Medlock Bridge Rd, Suite 820

Johns Creek, GA 30097

Defendant Attorneys

Karen Jean Kerechanin

Attorney at Goodman McGuffey LLP

3340 Peachtree Road, Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30326

Stephanie F. Glickauf

Attorney at Goodman McGuffey, LLP -Atl

Suite 2100, 3340 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1084

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery shall be on a six-month track and ends on 8/15/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on March 2, 2022. (ash) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Initial Disclosures by Frank McGowan, Paula McGowan.(Fuller, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Frank McGowan, Paula McGowan. (Fuller, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

4 #4

Exhibit ATTACHMENT E to Defendants Initial Disclosures

4 #3

Exhibit ATTACHMENT C to Defendants Initial Disclosures

4 #2

Exhibit ATTACHMENT B to Defendants Initial Disclosures

4 #1

Exhibit ATTACHMENT A to Defendants Initial Disclosures

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Kerechanin, Karen) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 6/13/2022.(Kerechanin, Karen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/14/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit -B -State Court Removal

1 #1

Exhibit -A -State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery shall be on a six-month track and ends on 8/15/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on March 2, 2022. (ash) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons and #5 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glickauf, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Disclosures by Frank McGowan, Paula McGowan.(Fuller, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Frank McGowan, Paula McGowan. (Fuller, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Disclosures by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ATTACHMENT A to Defendants Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit ATTACHMENT B to Defendants Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit ATTACHMENT C to Defendants Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit ATTACHMENT E to Defendants Initial Disclosures)(Kerechanin, Karen) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Kerechanin, Karen) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 6/13/2022.(Kerechanin, Karen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11516302) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -B -State Court Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie F. Glickauf