This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 11:52:20 (UTC).

McGlochlin v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 McGlochlin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Auto-Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03599

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roy McGlochlin

Defendant

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John G. Taussig, III

Attorney at Taussig Law Firm, LLC

5377 Manhattan Circle, Suite 203

Boulder, CO 80303

Scott David Smith

Attorney at Taussig & Smith LLC

1873 South Bellaire Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80222

Elaine T. Corey

Attorney at Taussig & Smith LLC

1873 South Bellaire Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80222

Defendant Attorneys

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Hannah Rachel Seifert

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

32 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT 1

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #31 Amended Complaint, AND JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff Roy McGlochlin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1)(Taussig, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

31 #5

Exhibit EXHIBIT 5

31 #4

Exhibit EXHIBIT 4

31 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT 3

31 #2

Exhibit EXHIBIT 2

31 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT 1

#31

(#31) AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Roy McGlochlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5)(Taussig, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information For Evan B. Stephenson by Evan Bennett Stephenson (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Roy McGlochlin.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

STATE COURT - Waiver and Acceptance of Service of Complaint

1 #4

STATE COURT - Summons

1 #3

STATE COURT - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #2

STATE COURT -Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2020cv30824. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7621634), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 STATE COURT -Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 STATE COURT - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 STATE COURT - Summons, #5 STATE COURT - Waiver and Acceptance of Service of Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #31 Amended Complaint, AND JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff Roy McGlochlin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1)(Taussig, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Roy McGlochlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5)(Taussig, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information For Evan B. Stephenson by Evan Bennett Stephenson (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information For Hannah R. Seifert by Hannah Rachel Seifert (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 January 2021. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for March 17, 2021 is rescheduled to 11:30 a.m. on that same morning (Time Change Only) in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The litigants (counsel and parties) and the public may appear at the conference either in person or by telephone. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 14 January 2021. This matter comes before the Court upon the parties' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #24 . Noting that the Motion is unopposed and for good cause shown, the Motion is granted. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for January 27, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled to March 17, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before February 3, 2021. Defendant shall file its answer or other response on or before February 17, 2021.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file Scheduling Order and Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Roy McGlochlin. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/13/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 13 January 2021. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for January 20, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled to January 27, 2021, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/20/2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file Scheduling Order and Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Roy McGlochlin. (Taussig, John) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7 January 2021. For good cause shown, Plaintiff's "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and to Re-Set Scheduling Conference" #20 is granted.The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for January 11, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for January 20, 2021, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/13/2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hannah Rachel Seifert on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney Hannah Rachel Seifert added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elaine T. Corey on behalf of Roy McGlochlinAttorney Elaine T. Corey added to party Roy McGlochlin(pty:pla) (Corey, Elaine) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott David Smith on behalf of Roy McGlochlinAttorney Scott David Smith added to party Roy McGlochlin(pty:pla) (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John G. Taussig, III on behalf of Roy McGlochlinAttorney John G. Taussig, III added to party Roy McGlochlin(pty:pla) (Taussig, John) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Roy McGlochlin.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2020cv30824. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7621634), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 STATE COURT -Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 STATE COURT - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 STATE COURT - Summons, #5 STATE COURT - Waiver and Acceptance of Service of Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah R. Seifert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Bennett Stephenson