This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 08:02:11 (UTC).

MCGINLEY v. THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 MCGINLEY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00135

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TINA MCGINLEY

Defendants

THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

JOHN DOES 1-10

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN S. FABRICANT

Attorney at BATHGATE, WEGENER & WOLF, PC

One Airport Road

Lakewood, NJ 08701

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13102637) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TINA MCGINLEY.(FABRICANT, JONATHAN). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TINA MCGINLEY. THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA waiver sent on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (FABRICANT, JONATHAN) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TINA MCGINLEY. THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA waiver sent on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (FABRICANT, JONATHAN) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13102637) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TINA MCGINLEY.(FABRICANT, JONATHAN). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN S. FABRICANT