This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2020 at 13:31:47 (UTC).

McGee v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 McGee filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00368

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark McGee

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Interested Party

SSA-Email Notification

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Anthony Walker

Attorney at Law Office of Mike Walker

1803 Broadway, Suite 618

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant Attorney

Bert Coleman

Attorney at Social Security Administration

601 East 12Th Street, Room 965

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

#12

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel on 5/20/2020 by Mark McGee. (mg) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, Dept. of Justice on 5/18/2020 by Mark McGee. (mg) (Main Document 12 replaced on 6/4/2020) (mg). (Main Document 12 replaced on 6/4/2020) (mg). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 6/3/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketKS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (mg) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Waived) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert) Modified on 6/2/2020 (mg). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Donald Cochran, United States Attorney on 5/19/2020 by Mark McGee. (mg) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons along with 285 form issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Documents forwarded to U.S. Marshal to effect service. (mg) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE: Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Docket No. #2 ) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/2/2020. (mg) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Consent of the Parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (Walker, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Anthony Walker. (mg) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT re #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #1 Social Security Complaint by Mark McGee. (mg) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mark McGee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed IFP Application)(mg) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Mark McGee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Anthony Walker