This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2021 at 09:42:24 (UTC).

McGee et al v. Lopinto et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 McGee filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lopinto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry W Ashe and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00571

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nathan O'Quinn

Inez Simmons

Tiffany McGee

Defendants

ABC Insurance Agency

Samuel Norton

Blake Nuzzo

Michael LeBlanc

Dwayne J. Munch, Sr.

Sean Parker

Ronnell Laporte

Mathew Smithey

XYZ Insurance Agency

Westwego City

Joseph P. Lopinto, III

Andrew Chauvet

Ronell Laporte

Unidentified Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Murell

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Lance Covington Unglesby

Attorney at Jason Rogers Williams & Associates

607 St. Charles Ave.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ronald Sidney Haley, Jr.

Attorney at Haley & Associates Attorneys At Law, LLC

8211 Goodwood Blvd., Suite E

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Lewis Unglesby, Sr

Attorney at Jason Rogers Williams & Associates

607 St. Charles Ave.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dedrick Arvell Moore

Attorney at Law Office of Dedrick A.. Moore

4962 Florida Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8783567) filed by Inez Simmons, Nathan O'Quinn, Tiffany McGee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Tiffany McGee(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Nathan O'Quinn(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Inez Simmons(pty:pla).(Murell, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/23/2021) (bm). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (bm) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8783567) filed by Inez Simmons, Nathan O'Quinn, Tiffany McGee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Tiffany McGee(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Nathan O'Quinn(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Inez Simmons(pty:pla).(Murell, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/23/2021) (bm). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis O. Unglesby

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Covington Unglesby