This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:29:32 (UTC).

McGary v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 McGary filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Thomas G. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01914

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bradney Henry McGary

Jesup, GA 31599

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lisa Marie Thelwell

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM

Suite 3200, 400 N Tampa St

Tampa, FL 33602-4798

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Mailing Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Bradney Henry McGary. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 09/21/2020)

6 #1

Mailing Envelope

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bradney Henry McGary. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/8/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

4 #1

Mailing Envelope

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of service by Bradney Henry McGary re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-78-T-33TGW. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-78-T-33TGW filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thelwell, Lisa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER directing the United States of America to respond to Bradney Henry McGary's Motion to Vacate. (Doc. #1). Response due by September 1, 2020. McGary may have 25 days to reply to the response. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/18/2020. (AR) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-78-T-33TGW filed by Bradney Henry McGary. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MCB) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Bradney Henry McGary. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bradney Henry McGary. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/8/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of service by Bradney Henry McGary re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-78-T-33TGW. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-78-T-33TGW filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thelwell, Lisa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER directing the United States of America to respond to Bradney Henry McGary's Motion to Vacate. (Doc. #1). Response due by September 1, 2020. McGary may have 25 days to reply to the response. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/18/2020. (AR) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-78-T-33TGW filed by Bradney Henry McGary. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MCB) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less