This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2023 at 10:16:39 (UTC).

MCFARLANE v. LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 MCFARLANE filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark R. Hornak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00283

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark R. Hornak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHASITY MCFARLANE

Defendants

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

LOANCARE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua P. Ward

Justin Michael Bahorich, I

Defendant Attorneys

Joe Nguyen

Michelle Badolato

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by CHASITY MCFARLANE. (Bahorich, Justin) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bahorich, Justin) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Badolato on behalf of LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, LOANCARE, LLC. Attorney Benjamin E. Gordon terminated. (Badolato, Michelle) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Nguyen on behalf of LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, LOANCARE, LLC. (Nguyen, Joe) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, LOANCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gordon, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying ServiceLink NLS, LLC; ServiceLink Holdings, LLC; ServiceLink Holdings, Inc.; Fidelity National Financial, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LOANCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gordon, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

5 #1

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying Bayview MSR Opportunity Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gordon, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/24/23. (jad) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #5

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Including State Court Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-23-000876 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7551749), filed by LOANCARE, LLC, LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Including State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Certificate of Service) (jv) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER. A Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is hereby SCHEDULED for 4/26/23 at 4:00 PM before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak. Please refer to #4 AT&T Scheduling Notice and use dial-in no. 2 for this conference. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/5/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by CHASITY MCFARLANE. (Bahorich, Justin) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bahorich, Justin) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Badolato on behalf of LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, LOANCARE, LLC. Attorney Benjamin E. Gordon terminated. (Badolato, Michelle) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. Based on the telephonic request with Chambers from counsel for the Defendants, the deadline as set forth by the Order dated 3/2/23 at ECF No. 8 is hereby EXTENDED to 3/31/23. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/23/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Nguyen on behalf of LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, LOANCARE, LLC. (Nguyen, Joe) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Docket(#8) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of this date of this Order, counsel shall confer and submit to the Court the following documents: (a) A written report required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f), in the applicable format as set forth in the Appendices to the Local Rules; and, (b) A stipulation selecting an ADR process (pursuant to Local Rule 16.2) (current form). Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/2/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, LOANCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gordon, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying ServiceLink NLS, LLC; ServiceLink Holdings, LLC; ServiceLink Holdings, Inc.; Fidelity National Financial, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LOANCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gordon, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying Bayview MSR Opportunity Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gordon, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/24/23. (jad) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 3/2/2023. (jv) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-23-000876 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7551749), filed by LOANCARE, LLC, LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Including State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Certificate of Service) (jv) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less