This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 09:42:20 (UTC).

McFarland v. New Prime, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 McFarland filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against New Prime, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00317

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Alan D Albright

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hunter McFarland

Defendants

William Charles McCammon

New Prime, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derrel J. Luce

Attorney at Luce Law Firm

4600 Bosque Blvd., # 2B

Waco, TX 76710-4606

Brandon Luce

Attorney at Luce Law Firm

4600 Bosque Blvd., Suite 2B

Waco, TX 76710

Defendant Attorneys

Robert J. Collins

Attorney at Gauntt, Earl, Binney & Koen, LLP

14643 Dallas Pkwy, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

Karl W. Koen

Attorney at Gauntt, Koen, Binney & Kidd, LLP

14643 Dallas Pkwy., Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske, Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2021, Discovery due by 6/4/2021, Motions due by 10/8/2021. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Proposed Scheduling Order by William Charles McCammon, New Prime, Inc.. (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#5

(#5) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by William Charles McCammon, New Prime, Inc.. (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#4

(#4) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske for all proceedings. Judge Alan D Albright no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE Consent and Reference of Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by all parties (Koen, Karl) Modified on 4/15/2021 (lad). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #4

List of Counsel of Record

1 #3

Index of State Court Documents

1 #2

Supplement Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Prime, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14649554), filed by New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of State Court Documents, #4 List of Counsel of Record)(Koen, Karl) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske, Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2021, Discovery due by 6/4/2021, Motions due by 10/8/2021. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Scheduling Order by William Charles McCammon, New Prime, Inc.. (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by William Charles McCammon, New Prime, Inc.. (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske for all proceedings. Judge Alan D Albright no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE Consent and Reference of Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by all parties (Koen, Karl) Modified on 4/15/2021 (lad). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Prime, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14649554), filed by New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of State Court Documents, #4 List of Counsel of Record)(Koen, Karl) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PRIME INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karl Wayne Koen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert James Collins